Maestro Group Limited, a registered company, was registered on 19 Sep 2013. 9429030053403 is the NZBN it was issued. "Hamburger retailing" (ANZSIC H451230) is how the company is classified. This company has been run by 4 directors: John Nicholas Elliott - an active director whose contract began on 19 Sep 2013,
Roger John Harper - an active director whose contract began on 12 Jun 2019,
Charles David Belcher - an inactive director whose contract began on 03 Aug 2018 and was terminated on 12 Feb 2021,
Deborah Elliott - an inactive director whose contract began on 19 Sep 2013 and was terminated on 31 Jul 2014.
Updated on 05 Aug 2024, our data contains detailed information about 1 address: 259 Onehunga Mall, Onehunga, Auckland, 1061 (category: delivery, delivery).
Other names for the company, as we found at BizDb, included: from 18 Sep 2013 to 16 Feb 2021 they were called Maestro Cafes Limited.
A total of 1000 shares are issued to 8 shareholders (3 groups). The first group includes 375 shares (37.5%) held by 3 entities. Next there is the second group which consists of 2 shareholders in control of 375 shares (37.5%). Lastly there is the next share allotment (250 shares 25%) made up of 3 entities.
Other active addresses
Address #4: Po Box 9894, Newmarket, Auckland, 1149 New Zealand
Postal address used from 21 Apr 2020
Address #5: 259 Onehunga Mall, Onehunga, Auckland, 1061 New Zealand
Delivery address used from 06 Apr 2023
Principal place of activity
12 Florence Avenue, Orewa, Orewa, 0931 New Zealand
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 1000
Annual return filing month: March
Annual return last filed: 01 Apr 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 375 | |||
Director | Harper, Roger John |
Epsom Auckland 1023 New Zealand |
02 Aug 2021 - |
Individual | Harper, Elizabeth |
Epsom Auckland 1023 New Zealand |
02 Aug 2021 - |
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Business Trustees 2012 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429030676701 |
Orewa Orewa 0931 New Zealand |
02 Aug 2021 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 375 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Elliott Trustee Company Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429033939377 |
Epsom Auckland 1023 New Zealand |
19 Sep 2013 - |
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Business Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429039429575 |
Orewa 0931 New Zealand |
19 Sep 2013 - |
Shares Allocation #3 Number of Shares: 250 | |||
Individual | Belcher, Emma Leah |
Onehunga Auckland 1061 New Zealand |
02 Aug 2021 - |
Individual | Calkin, Todd James |
Onehunga Auckland 1061 New Zealand |
02 Aug 2021 - |
Individual | Belcher, Charles David |
Onehunga Auckland 1061 New Zealand |
02 Aug 2021 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Director | Elliott, John |
Epsom Auckland 1023 New Zealand |
19 Sep 2013 - 02 Aug 2021 |
Director | Elliott, John |
Epsom Auckland 1023 New Zealand |
19 Sep 2013 - 02 Aug 2021 |
Director | Elliott, John |
Epsom Auckland 1023 New Zealand |
19 Sep 2013 - 02 Aug 2021 |
Individual | Elliott, Deborah |
Epsom Auckland 1023 New Zealand |
19 Sep 2013 - 02 Aug 2021 |
John Nicholas Elliott - Director
Appointment date: 19 Sep 2013
Address: Epsom, Auckland, 1023 New Zealand
Address used since 20 Jan 2015
Roger John Harper - Director
Appointment date: 12 Jun 2019
Address: Rd 3, Warkworth, 0983 New Zealand
Address used since 20 Apr 2022
Address: Epsom, Auckland, 1023 New Zealand
Address used since 12 Jun 2019
Charles David Belcher - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 03 Aug 2018
Termination date: 12 Feb 2021
Address: Onehunga, Auckland, 1061 New Zealand
Address used since 03 Aug 2018
Deborah Elliott - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 19 Sep 2013
Termination date: 31 Jul 2014
Address: Epsom, Auckland, 1023 New Zealand
Address used since 19 Sep 2013
Lijas Properties Limited
1st Floor, Florence House
Warkworth Tours Limited
12 Florence Avenue
Margreve Limited
10 The Ritz
P Geurts & Sons Builders Limited
81 Florence Avenue
Joli Trustees Limited
Flat 2, 25 Edward Avenue
Mw Silverdale Holdings Limited
12 Florence Avenue
Imprint Restaurant Group Limited
865 Beach Road
Luxury Time Limited
2882 Kaipara Coast Highway
Silverdale Burgers Limited
13 Sawyers Lane
Too Fat Buns Limited
95 Bond Crescent
Virtucon Limited
22 Anzac Street
Younz Limited
1st Floor 178 Hibiscus Highway