Asga Investments Limited was incorporated on 09 Jul 2013 and issued a number of 9429030155879. This registered LTD company has been managed by 4 directors: Paul Robert Alexander - an active director whose contract began on 09 Jul 2013,
Alister James Stevenson - an inactive director whose contract began on 09 Jul 2013 and was terminated on 06 Nov 2018,
Colin Stuart Gray - an inactive director whose contract began on 09 Jul 2013 and was terminated on 19 Oct 2018,
Pita Shand Alexander - an inactive director whose contract began on 09 Jul 2013 and was terminated on 05 Apr 2016.
According to our database (updated on 23 Aug 2024), the company uses 1 address: Level 4, 7 Winston Avenue, Papanui, Christchurch, 8053 (type: physical, service).
Up until 14 Dec 2018, Asga Investments Limited had been using First Floor, Unit 1, Amuri Park, 25 Churchill Street, Christchurch as their registered address.
A total of 225100 shares are allotted to 4 groups (9 shareholders in total). In the first group, 168750 shares are held by 3 entities, namely:
Alexander, Paul Robert (a director) located at Saint Albans, Christchurch postcode 8014,
Hedges, Gregory Watson (an individual) located at Ilam, Christchurch postcode 8041,
Alexander, Jane Patricia (an individual) located at Swannanoa, Kaiapoi postcode 7692.
The second group consists of 1 shareholder, holds 0.02 per cent shares (exactly 50 shares) and includes
Alexander, Paul Robert - located at Saint Albans, Christchurch.
The third share allocation (50 shares, 0.02%) belongs to 2 entities, namely:
Alexander, Pita Shand, located at Hanmer Springs (an individual),
Pita Alexander, located at Mairehau, Christchurch (a director). Asga Investments Limited was classified as "Floor covering retailing" (ANZSIC G421220).
Previous addresses
Address: First Floor, Unit 1, Amuri Park, 25 Churchill Street, Christchurch, 8013 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 01 Apr 2016 to 14 Dec 2018
Address: Unit 1, 25 Churchill Street, Christchurch Central, Christchurch, 8013 New Zealand
Registered address used from 22 Jul 2015 to 01 Apr 2016
Address: Unit 1, 25 Churchill Street, Christchurch Central, Christchurch, 8013 New Zealand
Registered address used from 09 Jul 2013 to 22 Jul 2015
Address: Unit 1, 25 Churchill Street, Christchurch Central, Christchurch, 8013 New Zealand
Physical address used from 09 Jul 2013 to 01 Apr 2016
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 225100
Annual return filing month: April
Annual return last filed: 30 Apr 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 168750 | |||
Director | Alexander, Paul Robert |
Saint Albans Christchurch 8014 New Zealand |
09 Jul 2013 - |
Individual | Hedges, Gregory Watson |
Ilam Christchurch 8041 New Zealand |
14 Mar 2016 - |
Individual | Alexander, Jane Patricia |
Swannanoa Kaiapoi 7692 New Zealand |
09 Jul 2013 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Director | Alexander, Paul Robert |
Saint Albans Christchurch 8014 New Zealand |
09 Jul 2013 - |
Shares Allocation #3 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Individual | Alexander, Pita Shand |
Hanmer Springs 7334 New Zealand |
09 Jul 2013 - |
Director | Pita Shand Alexander |
Mairehau Christchurch 8013 New Zealand |
09 Jul 2013 - |
Shares Allocation #4 Number of Shares: 56250 | |||
Individual | Alexander, Pita Shand |
Hanmer Springs 7334 New Zealand |
09 Jul 2013 - |
Individual | Hedges, Gregory Watson |
Ilam Christchurch 8041 New Zealand |
14 Mar 2016 - |
Individual | Alexander, Jane Patricia |
Swannanoa Kaiapoi 7692 New Zealand |
09 Jul 2013 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Gray, Gill |
Russley Christchurch 8042 New Zealand |
09 Jul 2013 - 02 Nov 2018 |
Individual | Stevenson, Christine Margaret |
North New Brighton Christchurch 8083 New Zealand |
09 Jul 2013 - 10 Nov 2018 |
Individual | Stevenson, Alister James |
North New Brighton Christchurch 8083 New Zealand |
09 Jul 2013 - 10 Nov 2018 |
Individual | Smith, Richard |
148 Victoria Street Christchurch 8013 New Zealand |
09 Jul 2013 - 02 Nov 2018 |
Individual | Gray, Colin Stuart |
Russley Christchurch 8042 New Zealand |
09 Jul 2013 - 02 Nov 2018 |
Paul Robert Alexander - Director
Appointment date: 09 Jul 2013
Address: Saint Albans, Christchurch, 8014 New Zealand
Address used since 09 Jul 2013
Alister James Stevenson - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 09 Jul 2013
Termination date: 06 Nov 2018
Address: North New Brighton, Christchurch, 8083 New Zealand
Address used since 09 Jul 2013
Colin Stuart Gray - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 09 Jul 2013
Termination date: 19 Oct 2018
Address: Russley, Christchurch, 8042 New Zealand
Address used since 09 Jul 2013
Pita Shand Alexander - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 09 Jul 2013
Termination date: 05 Apr 2016
Address: Mairehau, Christchurch, 8013 New Zealand
Address used since 09 Jul 2013
Designa Electronics Limited
Unit 5, Amuri Park, 404 Barbadoes Street
Boulding Technology Limited
404 Barbadoes Street
Pipiot Limited
Unit 5, Amuri Park
Spore Lab Limited
5 Amuri Park, 404 Barbadoes St
Fabric House Limited
Unit 5, 404 Barbadoes Street
Tape Replacement Limited
Unit 5, 404 Barbadoes Street
Canterbury Carpet Company Limited
433 St Asaph Street
Carpet Kingdom Limited
49 Ferry Road
David Watkins Flooring Limited
C/-grant Thornton
Flooring Specialists Limited
Polson Higgs & Co, Level 6, Claredon
Home Insulation Christchurch Limited
476 St Asaph Street
Nicholls Syndicate Limited
Level 1, 79 Cambridge Street