Property4Rent Limited was incorporated on 16 Jul 2013 and issued an NZ business identifier of 9429030211100. The registered LTD company has been run by 2 directors: Belinda Ann Kay-Williamson - an active director whose contract began on 16 Jul 2013,
Stephen David Williamson - an inactive director whose contract began on 16 Jul 2013 and was terminated on 04 Feb 2021.
According to our data (last updated on 23 Aug 2024), this company filed 1 address: Po Box 21034, Edgeware, Christchurch, 8140 (types include: postal, office).
Until 05 Jun 2014, Property4Rent Limited had been using 109 Blenheim Road, Riccarton, Christchurch as their registered address.
A total of 100 shares are issued to 2 groups (3 shareholders in total). When considering the first group, 50 shares are held by 2 entities, namely:
Williamson, Stephen David (an individual) located at Parklands, Christchurch postcode 8083,
Stephen Williamson (a director) located at Parklands, Christchurch postcode 8083.
The second group consists of 1 shareholder, holds 50% shares (exactly 50 shares) and includes
Kay-Williamson, Belinda Ann - located at Christchurch. Property4Rent Limited was classified as "Rental of residential property" (business classification L671160).
Other active addresses
Address #4: Po Box 21034, Edgeware, Christchurch, 8140 New Zealand
Postal address used from 01 Jun 2023
Address #5: 109 Blenheim Road, Riccarton, Christchurch, 8041 New Zealand
Office & delivery address used from 01 Jun 2023
Previous addresses
Address #1: 109 Blenheim Road, Riccarton, Christchurch, 8041 New Zealand
Registered address used from 16 Jul 2013 to 05 Jun 2014
Address #2: 109 Blenheim Road, Riccarton, Christchurch, 8041 New Zealand
Physical address used from 16 Jul 2013 to 11 Jun 2015
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: May
Annual return last filed: 20 May 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Individual | Williamson, Stephen David |
Parklands Christchurch 8083 New Zealand |
16 Jul 2013 - |
Director | Stephen David Williamson |
Parklands Christchurch 8083 New Zealand |
16 Jul 2013 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Director | Kay-williamson, Belinda Ann |
Christchurch 8083 New Zealand |
16 Jul 2013 - |
Belinda Ann Kay-williamson - Director
Appointment date: 16 Jul 2013
Address: Christchurch, 8083 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Jun 2023
Address: Parklands, Christchurch, 8083 New Zealand
Address used since 16 Jul 2013
Stephen David Williamson - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 16 Jul 2013
Termination date: 04 Feb 2021
Address: Parklands, Christchurch, 8083 New Zealand
Address used since 16 Jul 2013
Transolve Global (nz) Limited
109 Blenheim Road
The Boundary Limited
109 Blenheim Road
Trevethick Trustees Limited
109 Blenheim Road
Meds Nz Limited
109 Blenheim Road
Burford Dental Group Limited
109 Blenheim Road
Arlington Experience Limited
109 Blenheim Road
Keogh Hill Investments Limited
109 Blenheim Road
Mack3 Limited
109 Blenheim Road
Mainland Investments Limited
Mackay Bailey Butchard Ltd
Maymillian Limited
109 Blenheim Road
Sutton Property Investments Limited
109 Blenheim Road
Trident Securities Limited
109 Blenheim Road