Ez Go Limited was launched on 10 Apr 2013 and issued an NZ business identifier of 9429030273788. This registered LTD company has been run by 3 directors: Chengbin Zhang - an active director whose contract started on 04 Jun 2017,
Jack Liu - an inactive director whose contract started on 01 Apr 2016 and was terminated on 01 Jan 2022,
Yang Zhang - an inactive director whose contract started on 10 Apr 2013 and was terminated on 05 Jun 2017.
As stated in BizDb's data (updated on 22 Aug 2024), this company filed 1 address: Unit 5, 270 Oteha Valley Road, Albany, Auckland, 0632 (category: postal, office).
Up until 12 Apr 2017, Ez Go Limited had been using 13 Catlins Place, Fairview Heights, Auckland as their registered address.
A total of 100 shares are issued to 2 groups (2 shareholders in total). As far as the first group is concerned, 50 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Zhang, Chengbin (an individual) located at Hobsonville, Auckland postcode 0616.
The second group consists of 1 shareholder, holds 50% shares (exactly 50 shares) and includes
Glory Days Trustees Limited - located at Ellerslie, Auckland. Ez Go Limited has been classified as "Investment - commercial property" (ANZSIC L671230).
Principal place of activity
13 Catlins Place, Fairview Heights, Auckland, 0632 New Zealand
Previous address
Address #1: 13 Catlins Place, Fairview Heights, Auckland, 0632 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 10 Apr 2013 to 12 Apr 2017
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: April
Annual return last filed: 01 May 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Individual | Zhang, Chengbin |
Hobsonville Auckland 0616 New Zealand |
04 Jun 2024 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Glory Days Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429041404607 |
Ellerslie Auckland 1051 New Zealand |
20 Apr 2016 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Zhang, Yang |
Hobsonville Auckland 0616 New Zealand |
01 May 2024 - 04 Jun 2024 |
Individual | Zhang, Chengbin |
Hobsonville Auckland 0616 New Zealand |
01 May 2024 - 01 May 2024 |
Director | Zhang, Chengbin |
Hobsonville Auckland 0616 New Zealand |
01 May 2024 - 01 May 2024 |
Individual | Zhang, Yang |
Castor Bay Auckland 0620 New Zealand |
10 Apr 2013 - 01 May 2024 |
Individual | Shan, Wenting |
Auckland 0623 New Zealand |
10 Jun 2013 - 20 Apr 2016 |
Chengbin Zhang - Director
Appointment date: 04 Jun 2017
Address: Hobsonville, Auckland, 0616 New Zealand
Address used since 04 Jun 2017
Jack Liu - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 01 Apr 2016
Termination date: 01 Jan 2022
Address: Campbells Bay, Auckland, 0630 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Apr 2016
Yang Zhang - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 10 Apr 2013
Termination date: 05 Jun 2017
Address: Hobsonville, Auckland, 0616 New Zealand
Address used since 18 Jan 2024
Address: Castor Bay, Auckland, 0620 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Jan 2019
Address: Fairview Heights, Auckland, 0632 New Zealand
Address used since 10 Apr 2013
Jixuan Trustee Limited
17 Catlins Place
Nextra Limited
19 Catlins Place
Air Temperature Control Limited
8 Catlins Place
Golden Cyber Management Limited
14 Rising Parade
Yongqing Limited
14 Rising Parade
Nalli's Fashion Textile Limited
Flat 12, 10 John Jennings Drive
Diydad Limited
789 East Coast Road
Fengs Corporate Trustee Two Limited
21 Springvale Drive
Fortuna Alliance Limited
37 Harrowglen Drive
Hawea Investments Limited
157 Oteha Valley Rd
Huajing Trust Holdings Limited
5 Hilton Close
Sapphire Corporation Limited
32 Harrowglen Drive