Eco Move (New Zealand) Limited was registered on 30 Jan 2013 and issued an NZ business number of 9429030380387. This registered LTD company has been managed by 3 directors: Stefan Ernst Wobking - an active director whose contract began on 20 Mar 2014,
Timothy Lloyd Rountree - an active director whose contract began on 01 Sep 2016,
Rachel Jane Tabone - an inactive director whose contract began on 30 Jan 2013 and was terminated on 20 Mar 2014.
According to BizDb's database (updated on 17 Jul 2024), this company uses 4 addresses: 7 Isaac Place, East Tamaki Heights, Auckland, 2016 (service address),
7 Isaac Place, East Tamaki Heights, Auckland, 2016 (registered address),
61A Howe Street, Howick, Auckland, 2014 (physical address),
61A Howe Street, Howick, Auckland, 2014 (office address) among others.
Up to 30 Aug 2023, Eco Move (New Zealand) Limited had been using 61A Howe Street, Howick, Auckland as their registered address.
A total of 1000 shares are allotted to 3 groups (4 shareholders in total). As far as the first group is concerned, 425 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Wobking, Stefan Ernst (an individual) located at 39-41 Abbott Street, Sandringham postcode 3191.
Another group consists of 1 shareholder, holds 25 per cent shares (exactly 250 shares) and includes
Rountree, Timothy - located at Howick, Auckland.
The next share allocation (325 shares, 32.5%) belongs to 2 entities, namely:
Tabone, Rachel Jane, located at 39-41 Abbott Street, Sandringham (an individual),
Rachel Tabone, located at 39-41 Abbott Street, Sandringham (a director). Eco Move (New Zealand) Limited was classified as "Container hiring" (ANZSIC L661925).
Other active addresses
Address #4: 7 Isaac Place, East Tamaki Heights, Auckland, 2016 New Zealand
Service & registered address used from 30 Aug 2023
Principal place of activity
61a Howe Street, Howick, Auckland, 2014 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: 61a Howe Street, Howick, Auckland, 2014 New Zealand
Registered & service address used from 02 Sep 2021 to 30 Aug 2023
Address #2: 22 Carriage Close, Northpark, Auckland, 2013 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 20 Aug 2018 to 02 Sep 2021
Address #3: 24-26 Pollen Street, Ponsonby, Auckland, 1021 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 31 May 2017 to 20 Aug 2018
Address #4: 36 Millhouse Drive, Northpark, Auckland, 2013 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 12 Sep 2016 to 31 May 2017
Address #5: 22 Castellina Drive, Karaka, Papakura, 2113 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 14 Aug 2014 to 12 Sep 2016
Address #6: Level 8, 57 Fort Street, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 30 Jan 2013 to 14 Aug 2014
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 1000
Annual return filing month: August
Financial report filing month: March
Annual return last filed: 22 Aug 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 425 | |||
Individual | Wobking, Stefan Ernst |
39-41 Abbott Street Sandringham 3191 Australia |
30 Jan 2013 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 250 | |||
Individual | Rountree, Timothy |
Howick Auckland 2014 New Zealand |
03 Sep 2016 - |
Shares Allocation #3 Number of Shares: 325 | |||
Individual | Tabone, Rachel Jane |
39-41 Abbott Street Sandringham 3191 Australia |
30 Jan 2013 - |
Director | Rachel Jane Tabone |
39-41 Abbott Street Sandringham 3191 Australia |
30 Jan 2013 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Smithwick, Benjamin |
Bentleigh 3204 Australia |
30 Jan 2013 - 03 Sep 2016 |
Stefan Ernst Wobking - Director
Appointment date: 20 Mar 2014
Address: Sandringham, 3191 Australia
Address used since 05 Aug 2014
Timothy Lloyd Rountree - Director
Appointment date: 01 Sep 2016
Address: East Tamaki Heights, Auckland, 2016 New Zealand
Address used since 22 Aug 2023
Address: Howick, Auckland, 2014 New Zealand
Address used since 16 Aug 2021
Address: Northpark, Auckland, 2013 New Zealand
Address used since 10 Aug 2018
Address: Northpark, Auckland, 2013 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Sep 2016
Rachel Jane Tabone - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 30 Jan 2013
Termination date: 20 Mar 2014
Address: Bentleigh, 3204 Australia
Address used since 30 Jan 2013
Bob's Properties Limited
24-26 Pollen Street
Bloomfields Garden Centre Limited
24-26 Pollen Street
Ns Seven Holdings Limited
24-26 Pollen St
Find My Limited
24-26 Pollen Street
Aspiring Building Consultants Limited
24-26 Pollen Street
Duthie And Associates Limited
24-26 Pollen Street
Hardcase Container Hire Limited
11 Cheshire Street
Hjs Trustee Limited
14 Ryle Street
Kinaroad Limited
Level 4
Restart Containers Limited
1 Cowan Street
Tlr Systems Limited
24/26 Pollen Street, Ponsonby