Sustainability Options Limited was registered on 20 Aug 2012 and issued a New Zealand Business Number of 9429030550827. This registered LTD company has been managed by 3 directors: Phillip Andrew Wentworth Gregg - an active director whose contract started on 20 Aug 2012,
Philip Andrew Wentworth Gregg - an active director whose contract started on 20 Aug 2012,
Nicholas Peter Wentworth Gregg - an active director whose contract started on 20 Aug 2012.
As stated in BizDb's data (updated on 14 Sep 2024), this company registered 1 address: 59A Seventh Avenue, Tauranga, Tauranga, 3110 (category: office, delivery).
Until 13 Feb 2019, Sustainability Options Limited had been using 24 Louise Drive, Ohauiti, Tauranga as their registered address.
A total of 200 shares are allocated to 4 groups (4 shareholders in total). As far as the first group is concerned, 99 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Gregg, Phillip Andrew Wentworth (a director) located at Tauranga, Tauranga postcode 3110.
Another group consists of 1 shareholder, holds 49.5% shares (exactly 99 shares) and includes
Gregg, Nicholas Peter Wentworth - located at Otumoetai, Tauranga.
The 3rd share allotment (1 share, 0.5%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Gregg, Phillip Andrew Wentworth, located at Ohauiti, Tauranga (a director). Sustainability Options Limited is categorised as "Solar hot water system installation" (ANZSIC E323170).
Principal place of activity
59a Seventh Avenue, Tauranga, Tauranga, 3110 New Zealand
Previous address
Address #1: 24 Louise Drive, Ohauiti, Tauranga, 3112 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 20 Aug 2012 to 13 Feb 2019
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 200
Annual return filing month: September
Annual return last filed: 04 Sep 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 99 | |||
Director | Gregg, Phillip Andrew Wentworth |
Tauranga Tauranga 3110 New Zealand |
20 Aug 2012 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 99 | |||
Director | Gregg, Nicholas Peter Wentworth |
Otumoetai Tauranga 3110 New Zealand |
20 Aug 2012 - |
Shares Allocation #3 Number of Shares: 1 | |||
Director | Gregg, Phillip Andrew Wentworth |
Ohauiti Tauranga 3112 New Zealand |
20 Aug 2012 - |
Shares Allocation #4 Number of Shares: 1 | |||
Individual | Gregg, Alison Gaylene |
Otumoetai Tauranga 3110 New Zealand |
12 Mar 2013 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Gregg, David Brian Wenthworth |
Otumoetai Tauranga 3110 New Zealand |
20 Aug 2012 - 08 Sep 2021 |
Individual | Gregg, Fiona |
Ohauiti Tauranga 3112 New Zealand |
12 Mar 2013 - 05 Sep 2017 |
Phillip Andrew Wentworth Gregg - Director
Appointment date: 20 Aug 2012
Address: Tauranga, Tauranga, 3110 New Zealand
Address used since 04 Feb 2019
Philip Andrew Wentworth Gregg - Director
Appointment date: 20 Aug 2012
Address: Ohauiti, Tauranga, 3112 New Zealand
Address used since 11 Aug 2013
Nicholas Peter Wentworth Gregg - Director
Appointment date: 20 Aug 2012
Address: Otumoetai, Tauranga, 3110 New Zealand
Address used since 28 Feb 2016
Dreamcatcher Solutions Limited
23 Mervyn Place
Bothwell Builders Limited
9 Mervyn Place
Trustee Service No 1 Limited
103 Boscabel Drive
Encompass Procurement Limited
19 Bertrowe Drive
Kalina Trustee Limited
175 Hollister Lane
Unix Co Limited
9 Dayna Avenue
Dot Com Aotearoa Limited
32 Carew Street
Jivass Limited
10 Ravenscourt Place
Plumbing And Gas Works Limited
Flat 1, 4a Mill Lane
Solar Corp Nz Limited
279 Te Puke Quarry Road
Solar Options (nz) Limited
106 Commerce Street
Suntrenz Limited
Unit 6, 11 Ashley Place,