Beertique Nz Limited was incorporated on 10 Jul 2012 and issued an NZ business number of 9429030592957. The in liquidation LTD company has been run by 3 directors: Philip Iain Dale - an active director whose contract started on 20 Nov 2012,
Melissa Jayne Dale - an active director whose contract started on 01 Jul 2022,
Melissa Jayne Dale - an inactive director whose contract started on 10 Jul 2012 and was terminated on 02 Mar 2021.
As stated in our database (last updated on 19 Nov 2023), this company registered 6 addresess: Level 6, 5 Short Street, Newmarket, Auckland, 1049 (registered address),
Level 6, 5 Short Street, Newmarket, Auckland, 1049 (service address),
Suite 1, 16 Bishop Dunn Place, Flat Bush, Auckland, 2013 (registered address),
Unit 1, 230B Neilson Street, Onehunga, Auckland, 1061 (registered address) among others.
Until 10 Mar 2021, Beertique Nz Limited had been using 230B Neilson Street, Onehunga, Auckland as their registered address.
A total of 500006 shares are allocated to 2 groups (2 shareholders in total). As far as the first group is concerned, 250005 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Dale, Philip Iain (an individual) located at Beachlands, Auckland postcode 2018.
Then there is a group that consists of 1 shareholder, holds 50% shares (exactly 250001 shares) and includes
Dale, Melissa - located at Beachlands, Auckland. Beertique Nz Limited was categorised as "Cold store operation" (ANZSIC I530920).
Other active addresses
Address #4: Suite 1, 16 Bishop Dunn Place, Flat Bush, Auckland, 2013 New Zealand
Service address used from 21 Feb 2023
Address #5: Suite 1, 16 Bishop Dunn Place, Flat Bush, Auckland, 2013 New Zealand
Registered address used from 16 Aug 2023
Address #6: Level 6, 5 Short Street, Newmarket, Auckland, 1049 New Zealand
Registered & service address used from 13 Nov 2023
Principal place of activity
19 Ormiston Road, Otara, Auckland, 2016 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: 230b Neilson Street, Onehunga, Auckland, 1061 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 13 Jul 2017 to 10 Mar 2021
Address #2: 13b Sandspit Road, Cockle Bay, Auckland, 2014 New Zealand
Registered address used from 22 Jan 2015 to 13 Jul 2017
Address #3: 13b Sandspit Road, Cockle Bay, Auckland, 2014 New Zealand
Physical address used from 14 Jan 2015 to 13 Jul 2017
Address #4: 5 Silverwood Drive, Flat Bush, Auckland, 2016 New Zealand
Registered address used from 28 Nov 2012 to 22 Jan 2015
Address #5: 5 Silverwood Drive, Flat Bush, Auckland, 2016 New Zealand
Physical address used from 28 Nov 2012 to 14 Jan 2015
Address #6: 10 Terrasini Drive, Flat Bush, Auckland, 2016 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 10 Jul 2012 to 28 Nov 2012
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 500006
Annual return filing month: November
Annual return last filed: 07 Aug 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 250005 | |||
Individual | Dale, Philip Iain |
Beachlands Auckland 2018 New Zealand |
20 Nov 2012 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 250001 | |||
Individual | Dale, Melissa |
Beachlands Auckland 2018 New Zealand |
18 Jul 2022 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Kasimausi, Timothy |
Clover Park Auckland 2023 New Zealand |
18 Jul 2022 - 08 Aug 2023 |
Individual | Dale, Kyle Philip |
Green Island Dunedin 9018 New Zealand |
18 Jul 2022 - 08 Aug 2023 |
Individual | Dale, Jenna Elizabeth |
Rd 2 Outram 9074 New Zealand |
18 Jul 2022 - 08 Aug 2023 |
Individual | Chapman, Alan |
Goodwood Heights Auckland 2105 New Zealand |
23 Jul 2022 - 08 Aug 2023 |
Individual | Mallon, Colin Andrew |
Ngaio Wellington 6035 New Zealand |
25 Sep 2015 - 23 Aug 2019 |
Individual | Dale, Melissa Jayne |
Beachlands Auckland 2018 New Zealand |
10 Jul 2012 - 02 Mar 2021 |
Philip Iain Dale - Director
Appointment date: 20 Nov 2012
Address: Flat Bush, Auckland, 2019 New Zealand
Address used since 05 Feb 2018
Address: Cockle Bay, Auckland, 2014 New Zealand
Address used since 23 Jan 2015
Address: Beachlands, Auckland, 2018 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Jul 2019
Melissa Jayne Dale - Director
Appointment date: 01 Jul 2022
Address: Beachlands, Auckland, 2018 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Jul 2022
Melissa Jayne Dale - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 10 Jul 2012
Termination date: 02 Mar 2021
Address: Cockle Bay, Auckland, 2014 New Zealand
Address used since 23 Jan 2015
Address: Flat Bush, Auckland, 2019 New Zealand
Address used since 05 Feb 2018
Address: Beachlands, Auckland, 2018 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Jul 2019
230 Neilson Limited
1/230b Neilson Street
Precision Rubber (n.z.) Limited
228 Neilson Street
Goh Holdings (nz) Company Limited
108 Captain Springs Road
Stainless Welders Limited
106 Captian Springs Road
Stainless Welding (nz) Limited
106 Captain Springs Rd
P.c. Management Limited
114 Captain Springs Road
Cool Storage Express (nz) Limited
128a Tennyson Street
Everest Kool Solutionz Limited
22 Hatfield Heights
Icepak New Zealand Limited
1 Spartan Road
Icicle Nz Property Limited
Level 6, Chorus House
Manawatu Cold Storage Limited
Level 8, 120 Albert Street
Pelco Properties Limited
32 Portside Drive