Thai Container Limited was launched on 23 May 2012 and issued a New Zealand Business Number of 9429030653665. This registered LTD company has been run by 2 directors: Sokunpavy Seng - an active director whose contract started on 21 Sep 2012,
Rene Bell - an inactive director whose contract started on 23 May 2012 and was terminated on 07 Oct 2021.
As stated in BizDb's data (updated on 06 Sep 2024), this company uses 1 address: 3/112 Tuam Street, Christchurch Central, Christchurch, 8013 (type: registered, physical).
Up to 10 Mar 2022, Thai Container Limited had been using 151 Bealey Avenue, Christchurch Central, Christchurch as their registered address.
BizDb found former names used by this company: from 23 May 2012 to 16 Aug 2012 they were called Its Espresso Limited.
A total of 100 shares are allotted to 2 groups (2 shareholders in total). In the first group, 99 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Seng, Sokunpavy (an individual) located at St Albans, Christchurch postcode 8014.
The second group consists of 1 shareholder, holds 1 per cent shares (exactly 1 share) and includes
Bell, Rene - located at Bishopdale, Christchurch. Thai Container Limited has been categorised as "Ethnic food takeaways" (ANZSIC H451215).
Other active addresses
Address #4: 3/112 Tuam Street, Christchurch Central, Christchurch, 8013 New Zealand
Registered & physical & service address used from 10 Mar 2022
Principal place of activity
151 Bealey Avenue, Christchurch Central, Christchurch, 8013 New Zealand
Previous address
Address #1: 151 Bealey Avenue, Christchurch Central, Christchurch, 8013 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 23 May 2012 to 10 Mar 2022
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: June
Annual return last filed: 05 Jun 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 99 | |||
Individual | Seng, Sokunpavy |
St Albans Christchurch 8014 New Zealand |
30 Aug 2012 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 1 | |||
Individual | Bell, Rene |
Bishopdale Christchurch 8053 New Zealand |
23 May 2012 - |
Sokunpavy Seng - Director
Appointment date: 21 Sep 2012
Address: St Albans, Christchurch, 8014 New Zealand
Address used since 02 Mar 2022
Address: Christchurch Central, Christchurch, 8013 New Zealand
Address used since 28 Aug 2014
Rene Bell - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 23 May 2012
Termination date: 07 Oct 2021
Address: Bishopdale, Christchurch, 8053 New Zealand
Address used since 02 Mar 2022
Address: Christchurch Central, Christchurch, 8013 New Zealand
Address used since 23 May 2012
The Nz Orthopaedic Foot & Ankle Society Incorporated
Level 3
Veendrick Topelen Trustee Limited
919 Colombo Street
Circa Mk3 Limited
926 Colombo Street
Legacy Trust
C/-lellman Wearne Curragh Ltd
Hillat Holdings Limited
918 Colombo Street
Montat Holdings Limited
918 Colombo Street
Baldev Singh & Sons Limited
158f Edgeware Road
Baldev Singh Virdee Limited
158f Edgeware Road
Malaysia Delights Limited
100 Cathedral Square
Nilesh Palace Limited
Flat 1, 67 Caledonian Road
Prabha Lucky Limited
Flat 1, 67 Caledonian Road
Taste Of Egypt Papanui Limited
Unit 3, 75 Peterborough Street