Gingerbread Properties Limited, a removed company, was incorporated on 17 May 2012. 9429030674479 is the New Zealand Business Number it was issued. "Building, non-residential - renting or leasing" (ANZSIC L671210) is how the company is classified. This company has been supervised by 4 directors: Vivienne Joyce Larraine Willis - an active director whose contract began on 17 May 2012,
Debra May Willis - an active director whose contract began on 24 Aug 2016,
Sally Margaret Henry - an active director whose contract began on 24 Aug 2016,
John James Fenton Willis - an inactive director whose contract began on 17 May 2012 and was terminated on 24 Aug 2016.
Updated on 05 Jul 2024, our data contains detailed information about 1 address: 57 Sunnyhills Avenue, Glenview, Hamilton, 3206 (type: registered, service).
Gingerbread Properties Limited had been using 98 Vickery Street, Te Rapa, Hamilton as their registered address until 27 Mar 2015.
A total of 100 shares are allotted to 3 shareholders (3 groups). The first group consists of 33 shares (33%) held by 1 entity. Next there is the second group which consists of 1 shareholder in control of 34 shares (34%). Finally the next share allocation (33 shares 33%) made up of 1 entity.
Principal place of activity
11 Green Street, Frankton, Hamilton, 3204 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: 98 Vickery Street, Te Rapa, Hamilton, 3200 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 22 Jul 2013 to 27 Mar 2015
Address #2: 11 Green Street, Frankton, Hamilton, 3204 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 21 Dec 2012 to 22 Jul 2013
Address #3: 676 Grey Street, Hamilton East, Hamilton, 3216 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 17 May 2012 to 21 Dec 2012
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: March
Annual return last filed: 09 Mar 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 33 | |||
Individual | Willis, Debra May |
Glenview Hamilton 3206 New Zealand |
17 May 2012 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 34 | |||
Director | Willis, Vivienne Joyce Larraine |
Te Aroha 3206 New Zealand |
17 May 2012 - |
Shares Allocation #3 Number of Shares: 33 | |||
Individual | Henry, Sally Margaret |
Hamilton East 3216 New Zealand |
17 May 2012 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Barlow, Maria Bernadette |
Cambridge 3432 New Zealand |
17 May 2012 - 12 Jul 2013 |
Vivienne Joyce Larraine Willis - Director
Appointment date: 17 May 2012
Address: Te Aroha, Te Aroha, 3320 New Zealand
Address used since 19 Mar 2015
Debra May Willis - Director
Appointment date: 24 Aug 2016
Address: Glenview, Hamilton, 3206 New Zealand
Address used since 24 Aug 2016
Sally Margaret Henry - Director
Appointment date: 24 Aug 2016
Address: Hamilton, 3216 New Zealand
Address used since 24 Aug 2016
Address: Hamilton East, Hamilton, 3216 New Zealand
Address used since 07 Mar 2019
John James Fenton Willis - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 17 May 2012
Termination date: 24 Aug 2016
Address: Te Aroha, Te Aroha, 3320 New Zealand
Address used since 19 Mar 2015
Waikato Plastic Welding Specialists Limited
306 Kahikatea Drive
Methodist Church Samoa New Zealand Hamilton Parish
73 Higgins Road
Fluid Power Distributors Limited
101 Duke Street
Defcon Trust Limited
101 Duke Street
Plant & Boiler Services Hamilton Limited
355 Kahikatea Drive
Rangimahora Development Trust
9 Jessica Court
Mutuary Limited
28 Empire Street
Oliver's Enterprises Limited
85 Alexandra Street
Sirap Limited
Kpmg, Level 10, Kpmg Centre
Watchu Investments Limited
Level One
Whakatane Pharmacy Limited
C/- Ross Needham
Whitianga Fish Marketing Company Limited
C/- R.s.mc Cleery,