R.l. Kennett & Co (2012) Limited was started on 30 Apr 2012 and issued an NZ business identifier of 9429030731387. The registered LTD company has been run by 3 directors: Anne Madeleine Kennett - an active director whose contract began on 30 Apr 2012,
Neroli Mary Kennett - an inactive director whose contract began on 30 Apr 2012 and was terminated on 23 Jun 2019,
Anthony Robert Kennett - an inactive director whose contract began on 30 Apr 2012 and was terminated on 03 May 2017.
As stated in BizDb's data (last updated on 31 Aug 2024), the company uses 2 addresses: 85 Riccarton Road, Riccarton, Christchurch, 8011 (registered address),
85 Riccarton Road, Riccarton, Christchurch, 8011 (service address),
68 Mandeville Street, Riccarton, Christchurch, 8011 (physical address).
Until 01 Dec 2023, R.l. Kennett & Co (2012) Limited had been using 68 Mandeville Street, Riccarton, Christchurch as their registered address.
A total of 1500 shares are allocated to 1 group (1 sole shareholder). When considering the first group, 1500 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Kennett, Anne Madeleine (a director) located at Hoon Hay, Christchurch postcode 8025. R.l. Kennett & Co (2012) Limited has been categorised as "Jewellery retailing - except direct selling" (business classification G425310).
Previous address
Address #1: 68 Mandeville Street, Riccarton, Christchurch, 8011 New Zealand
Registered & service address used from 30 Apr 2012 to 01 Dec 2023
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 1500
Annual return filing month: October
Annual return last filed: 16 Nov 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 1500 | |||
Director | Kennett, Anne Madeleine |
Hoon Hay Christchurch 8025 New Zealand |
30 Apr 2012 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Kennett, Neroli Mary |
Westmorland Christchurch 8025 New Zealand |
30 Apr 2012 - 06 Jul 2020 |
Director | Anthony Robert Kennett |
Westmorland Christchurch 8025 New Zealand |
30 Apr 2012 - 19 May 2017 |
Individual | Kennett, Anthony Robert |
Westmorland Christchurch 8025 New Zealand |
30 Apr 2012 - 19 May 2017 |
Anne Madeleine Kennett - Director
Appointment date: 30 Apr 2012
Address: Hoon Hay, Christchurch, 8025 New Zealand
Address used since 26 Oct 2018
Address: Cashmere, Christchurch, 8022 New Zealand
Address used since 30 Apr 2012
Neroli Mary Kennett - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 30 Apr 2012
Termination date: 23 Jun 2019
Address: Westmorland, Christchurch, 8025 New Zealand
Address used since 30 Apr 2012
Anthony Robert Kennett - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 30 Apr 2012
Termination date: 03 May 2017
Address: Westmorland, Christchurch, 8025 New Zealand
Address used since 30 Apr 2012
Moore Limited
68 Mandeville Street
B Seymour Builders Limited
68 Mandeville Street
Prima Solid Surfaces Limited
68 Mandeville Street
Depend Building And Joinery Solutions Limited
68 Mandeville Street
Trends Distributors Limited
68 Mandeville Street
Helimoore Limited
68 Mandeville Street
Bayram Limited
6e Pope Street
Charitybridge Limited
119 Blenheim Road
Fab Jewels Limited
Flat 1, 29 Burdale Street
Heyday International Limited
1 Palazzo Lane
The Quadrale Limited
119 Blenheim Road
Vanessa New Zealand Limited
C/o Amico New Zealand Limited