Kpt Trust Limited was launched on 07 Mar 2012 and issued a New Zealand Business Number of 9429030762091. The registered LTD company has been managed by 2 directors: Suraj Keshvara - an active director whose contract started on 07 Mar 2012,
Ranjit Foga Jesa Keshvara - an active director whose contract started on 29 Aug 2017.
According to BizDb's data (last updated on 20 Jul 2024), this company filed 1 address: 43 Hanene Street, St Heliers, Auckland, 1071 (category: registered, service).
Up to 06 Sep 2017, Kpt Trust Limited had been using 510 Whitford Road, Rd 1, Howick as their physical address.
A total of 100 shares are issued to 2 groups (4 shareholders in total). As far as the first group is concerned, 50 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Keshvara, Suraj (a director) located at St Heliers, Auckland postcode 1071.
The 2nd group consists of 3 shareholders, holds 50 per cent shares (exactly 50 shares) and includes
Heald, David John - located at Hamilton,
Keshvara, Suraj - located at St Heliers, Auckland,
Keshvara, Ranjit - located at Beachlands, Auckland.
Previous addresses
Address #1: 510 Whitford Road, Rd 1, Howick, 2571 New Zealand
Physical address used from 03 Jan 2014 to 06 Sep 2017
Address #2: Waikato Innovation Park, Ruakura Road, Hamilton, 0000 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 07 Mar 2012 to 03 Jan 2014
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: April
Annual return last filed: 11 Apr 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Director | Keshvara, Suraj |
St Heliers Auckland 1071 New Zealand |
07 Mar 2012 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Individual | Heald, David John |
Hamilton 3283 New Zealand |
22 Aug 2017 - |
Director | Keshvara, Suraj |
St Heliers Auckland 1071 New Zealand |
07 Mar 2012 - |
Individual | Keshvara, Ranjit |
Beachlands Auckland 2018 New Zealand |
22 Aug 2017 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Entity | Grayson Law Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429032570410 Company Number: 2170344 |
07 Mar 2012 - 22 Aug 2017 | |
Entity | Grayson Law Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429032570410 Company Number: 2170344 |
07 Mar 2012 - 22 Aug 2017 |
Suraj Keshvara - Director
Appointment date: 07 Mar 2012
Address: St Heliers, Auckland, 1071 New Zealand
Address used since 07 Nov 2022
Address: Rd 1, Howick, 2571 New Zealand
Address used since 07 Mar 2012
Ranjit Foga Jesa Keshvara - Director
Appointment date: 29 Aug 2017
Address: Beachlands, Auckland, 2018 New Zealand
Address used since 29 Aug 2017
Winaki Limited
562 Whitford Road
Curex Limited
562 Whitford Road
Rarenuka Properties Limited
562 Whitford Road
Industrial Electrics Limited
1 Ambrose Lane
Pd Woodard Limited
5 Griggs Rd
Woodhawk Limited
5 Griggs Rd