Manufacturing Technologies Limited, a registered company, was registered on 05 Mar 2012. 9429030764767 is the business number it was issued. "Manufacturing nec" (business classification C259907) is how the company is categorised. The company has been managed by 3 directors: Nicolas David James Clarke - an active director whose contract began on 02 Dec 2013,
David Nicolas James Clarke - an active director whose contract began on 02 Dec 2013,
Paul Anthony Spittle - an inactive director whose contract began on 05 Mar 2012 and was terminated on 02 Dec 2013.
Last updated on 19 Aug 2024, our database contains detailed information about 1 address: 8 St Andrews Parkway, Waiwhakaiho, New Plymouth, 4312 (types include: office, delivery).
Manufacturing Technologies Limited had been using 12 St Andrews Parkway, Waiwhakaiho, New Plymouth as their registered address up until 12 Oct 2018.
One entity controls all company shares (exactly 100 shares) - Clarke, Nicolas David James - located at 4312, Waiwhakaiho, New Plymouth.
Principal place of activity
8 St Andrews Parkway, Waiwhakaiho, New Plymouth, 4312 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: 12 St Andrews Parkway, Waiwhakaiho, New Plymouth, 4312 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 11 Oct 2018 to 12 Oct 2018
Address #2: 37 Korotaha Terrace, Rothesay Bay, Auckland, 0630 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 08 Dec 2015 to 11 Oct 2018
Address #3: 3 Vine Street, Saint Marys Bay, Auckland, 1011 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 11 Dec 2013 to 08 Dec 2015
Address #4: 59 Tainui Road, Devonport, Auckland, 0624 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 05 Mar 2012 to 11 Dec 2013
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: October
Annual return last filed: 02 Oct 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 100 | |||
Individual | Clarke, Nicolas David James |
Waiwhakaiho New Plymouth 4312 New Zealand |
30 Sep 2022 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Clarke, David Nicolas James |
Rothesay Bay Auckland 0630 New Zealand |
02 Dec 2013 - 30 Sep 2022 |
Director | Paul Anthony Spittle |
Devonport Auckland 0624 New Zealand |
05 Mar 2012 - 02 Dec 2013 |
Individual | Spittle, Denise Angela |
Devonport Auckland 0624 New Zealand |
05 Mar 2012 - 02 Dec 2013 |
Individual | Spittle, Paul Anthony |
Devonport Auckland 0624 New Zealand |
05 Mar 2012 - 02 Dec 2013 |
Nicolas David James Clarke - Director
Appointment date: 02 Dec 2013
Address: Waiwhakaiho, New Plymouth, 4312 New Zealand
Address used since 05 Oct 2020
David Nicolas James Clarke - Director
Appointment date: 02 Dec 2013
Address: Waiwhakaiho, New Plymouth, 4312 New Zealand
Address used since 05 Oct 2020
Address: Rothesay Bay, Auckland, 0630 New Zealand
Address used since 21 Oct 2015
Address: Waiwhakaiho, New Plymouth, 4312 New Zealand
Address used since 03 Oct 2018
Paul Anthony Spittle - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 05 Mar 2012
Termination date: 02 Dec 2013
Address: Devonport, Auckland, 0624 New Zealand
Address used since 05 Mar 2012
Sandown Trustee Limited
31 Korotaha Terrace
Infoplan Limited
58 Beulah Avenue
Vox Consulting Limited
65 Beulah Avenue
Palmic Company Limited
2/25 Korotaha Terrace
Ammar Investments Limited
20a Kiteroa Terrace
A&o Distribution Limited
20a Kiteroa Terrace
A B 2018 Limited
3 Serrata Place
Coastal Country 2022 Limited
44b Masterton Road
English For Business Limited
6 Lyons Avenue
Sewansew Limited
4 Lyons Avenue
Textile Sample Manufacturing Limited
645 Beach Road
The Wardrobe Company (north Harbour) Limited
11 Gulf View Road