Botany Acupuncture Clinic Limited, a registered company, was started on 02 Nov 2011. 9429030911987 is the NZBN it was issued. "Health service nec" (business classification Q859940) is how the company has been classified. The company has been supervised by 2 directors: Wai Io Lio - an active director whose contract began on 02 Nov 2011,
Hiroyuki Hayashi - an inactive director whose contract began on 16 Jul 2014 and was terminated on 02 May 2016.
Last updated on 29 Jul 2024, the BizDb data contains detailed information about 6 addresses this company registered, namely: 7 Penwood Close, East Tamaki, East Tamaki, 2016 (delivery address),
7 Penwood Close, East Tamaki Heights, Auckland, 2016 (registered address),
206 Whitford Rd, Shamrock Park, Auckland, 2016 (registered address),
7 Penwood Close, East Tamaki Heights, Auckland, 2016 (physical address) among others.
Botany Acupuncture Clinic Limited had been using 7 Penwood Close, East Tamaki Heights, Auckland as their registered address up to 11 Apr 2022.
A single entity owns all company shares (exactly 100 shares) - Lio, Wai Io - located at 2016, East Tamaki Heights, Auckland.
Other active addresses
Address #4: 206 Whitford Rd, Shamrock Park, Auckland, 2016 New Zealand
Registered address used from 11 Apr 2022
Address #5: 7 Penwood Close, East Tamaki Heights, Auckland, 2016 New Zealand
Registered address used from 29 Mar 2023
Address #6: 7 Penwood Close, East Tamaki, East Tamaki, 2016 New Zealand
Delivery address used from 01 Oct 2023
Principal place of activity
206 Whitford Road, Shamrock Park, Auckland, 2016 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: 7 Penwood Close, East Tamaki Heights, Auckland, 2016 New Zealand
Registered address used from 12 Apr 2021 to 11 Apr 2022
Address #2: 72 Derbyshire Lane, Papakura, 2580 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 02 Apr 2020 to 12 Apr 2021
Address #3: 138 Jeffs Road, Flat Bush, Auckland, 2019 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 24 Apr 2018 to 02 Apr 2020
Address #4: 7 Penwood Close, East Tamaki Heights, Auckland, 2016 New Zealand
Registered address used from 01 Sep 2017 to 24 Apr 2018
Address #5: 7 Penwood Close, East Tamaki Heights, Auckland, 2016 New Zealand
Physical address used from 30 Aug 2017 to 24 Apr 2018
Address #6: 18/2 Bishop Dunn Place, Flat Bush, Auckland, 2016 New Zealand
Physical address used from 26 Oct 2016 to 30 Aug 2017
Address #7: 18/2 Bishop Dunn Place, Flat Bush, Auckland, 2016 New Zealand
Registered address used from 25 Mar 2013 to 01 Sep 2017
Address #8: 18/2 Bishop Dunn Place, Flat Bush, Auckland, 2016 New Zealand
Physical address used from 25 Mar 2013 to 26 Oct 2016
Address #9: 11, Briar Vale Place, Mission Heights, Auckland, 2016 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 30 Aug 2012 to 25 Mar 2013
Address #10: 62 Delmont Close, East Tamaki Heights, Auckland, 2016 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 02 Nov 2011 to 30 Aug 2012
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: March
Annual return last filed: 04 Mar 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 100 | |||
Director | Lio, Wai Io |
East Tamaki Heights Auckland 2016 New Zealand |
02 Nov 2011 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Lio, Wai In |
Shamrock Park Auckland 2016 New Zealand |
17 Oct 2016 - 21 Mar 2023 |
Individual | Hayashi, Hiroyuki |
East Tamaki Heights Auckland 2016 New Zealand |
29 Oct 2015 - 13 Jul 2016 |
Wai Io Lio - Director
Appointment date: 02 Nov 2011
Address: East Tamaki Heights, Auckland, 2016 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Apr 2022
Address: Shamrock Park, Auckland, 2016 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Apr 2022
Address: East Tamaki Heights, Auckland, 2016 New Zealand
Address used since 31 Mar 2021
Address: East Tamaki Heights, Auckland, 2016 New Zealand
Address used since 02 Apr 2013
Address: Papakura, 2580 New Zealand
Address used since 02 Oct 2018
Hiroyuki Hayashi - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 16 Jul 2014
Termination date: 02 May 2016
Address: East Tamaki Heights, Auckland, 2016 New Zealand
Address used since 16 Jul 2014
Snackle Limited
3 Askerne Drive
Liu Family Investments Limited
3 Askerne Drive
Th Liu Trustee Limited
3 Askerne Drive
Gmc Concrete Panels Supplies Limited
227 Jeffs Road
Era (pukekohe) Development Limited
55 Packspur Drive
Southern Ocean Homes Limited
226 Jeffs Road
Advanced Health Solutions Limited
477 Whitford Road
Botany Town Dentist Limited
2 Redcastle Drive
Browsink Limited
Suite 3, 277 Te Irirangi Drive
Limerick B Medical Limited
Room 110
Thein & Xie Limited
32 Gibbston Crescent
Tiana Total Healthcare Limited
37 Agapanthus Place