Allied Movers Limited, a registered company, was registered on 31 Aug 2011. 9429030963917 is the number it was issued. "Furniture storage service" (ANZSIC I530950) is how the company is classified. This company has been managed by 8 directors: Boris Marijanovic - an active director whose contract began on 30 Dec 2022,
Anthony Donellan - an active director whose contract began on 24 May 2024,
Michael Fredrick Schumann - an inactive director whose contract began on 30 Apr 2019 and was terminated on 24 May 2024,
Jacob George - an inactive director whose contract began on 30 Apr 2019 and was terminated on 30 Sep 2022,
Barry Smith - an inactive director whose contract began on 30 Apr 2019 and was terminated on 18 Jul 2019.
Updated on 26 Jul 2024, our data contains detailed information about 1 address: 15 Rakino Way, Site C, Mount Wellington, Auckland, 1060 (types include: registered, physical).
Allied Movers Limited had been using 8 Lockhart Place, Mount Wellington, Auckland as their registered address up until 21 Sep 2021.
A single entity owns all company shares (exactly 100 shares) - Sirva Group (Nz) Limited - located at 1060, Mount Wellington, Auckland.
Principal place of activity
8 Lockhart Place, Mount Wellington, Auckland, 1060 New Zealand
Previous address
Address #1: 8 Lockhart Place, Mount Wellington, Auckland, 1060 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 31 Aug 2011 to 21 Sep 2021
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: October
Annual return last filed: 06 Nov 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 100 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Sirva Group (nz) Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429034550151 |
Mount Wellington Auckland 1060 New Zealand |
31 Aug 2011 - |
Ultimate Holding Company
Boris Marijanovic - Director
Appointment date: 30 Dec 2022
ASIC Name: Sirva (asia Pacific) Pty Ltd
Address: Mount Coolum, Queensland, 4573 Australia
Address used since 30 Dec 2022
Anthony Donellan - Director
Appointment date: 24 May 2024
ASIC Name: Sirva (asia Pacific) Pty Ltd
Address: Port Kennedy, Western Australia, 6172 Australia
Address used since 24 May 2024
Michael Fredrick Schumann - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 30 Apr 2019
Termination date: 24 May 2024
ASIC Name: Sirva (asia Pacific) Pty Ltd
Address: Robina, Queensland, 4226 Australia
Address used since 02 Mar 2021
Address: Robina, Queensland, 4226 Australia
Address used since 30 Apr 2019
Address: Dandenong Victoria, 3175 Australia
Jacob George - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 30 Apr 2019
Termination date: 30 Sep 2022
Address: Sky Eleven, Singapore, 297724 Singapore
Address used since 07 Mar 2021
Address: 06 - 01, Keppel Towers, Singapore, Singapore
Address used since 30 Apr 2019
Barry Smith - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 30 Apr 2019
Termination date: 18 Jul 2019
ASIC Name: Sirva (asia Pacific) Pty Ltd
Address: Rowville, Victoria, 3178 Australia
Address used since 30 Apr 2019
Address: Dandenong, Victoria, 3175 Australia
Marko Filipovic - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 29 Jan 2014
Termination date: 30 Apr 2019
ASIC Name: Sirva (asia Pacific) Pty Ltd
Address: Brighton, Victoria, 3186 Australia
Address used since 29 Jan 2014
Address: Dandenong, Melbourne, 3175 Australia
Address: Dandenong, Melbourne, 3175 Australia
Jacqueline Grills - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 04 Oct 2011
Termination date: 01 Apr 2016
ASIC Name: Sirva (asia Pacific) Pty Ltd
Address: Dandenong, Melbourne, 3175 Australia
Address: Rowville, Victoria, 3178 Australia
Address used since 04 Oct 2011
Address: Dandenong, Melbourne, 3175 Australia
Graham John Sutcliffe - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 31 Aug 2011
Termination date: 29 Jan 2014
Address: Greenhithe, Auckland, 0632 New Zealand
Address used since 31 Aug 2011
New Zealand Yacon Limited
4 Lockhart Place
Rawhiti Manuka Honi Limited
Suite 1, 4 Lockhart Place
Griff Trading Limited
4 Lockhart Place
Turners Flower Exports N.z. Limited
4 Lockhart Place
Chai Limited
4 Lockhart Place
Taiwan New Zealand Screen Limited
4 Lockhart Place
Auckland Movers Limited
127 Main Highway
Brj Limited
Flat 1, 294 Ellerslie-panmure Highway
Fuwa Transport & Logistic Limited
40 Rockridge Avenue
Keith Trading Limited
85 Church Street
Safestore Containers (n.i.) Limited
89-91 Captain Springs Road
Tonys Transport Limited
132e Marua Road