Rrll 2011 Company Limited was launched on 24 Aug 2011 and issued an NZBN of 9429030975477. This registered LTD company has been managed by 2 directors: Sally Lu - an active director whose contract began on 01 Mar 2024,
Yue Gui Li - an inactive director whose contract began on 24 Aug 2011 and was terminated on 01 Mar 2024.
As stated in BizDb's information (updated on 01 Aug 2024), the company registered 1 address: 349 Dominion Road, Mount Eden, Auckland, 1024 (category: registered, service).
Until 27 Sep 2017, Rrll 2011 Company Limited had been using Asb Bank Centre Level 18, 135 Albert Street, Auckland as their physical address.
A total of 100 shares are allocated to 1 group (1 sole shareholder). As far as the first group is concerned, 100 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Lu, Sally (a director) located at Royal Oak, Auckland postcode 1023. Rrll 2011 Company Limited has been categorised as "Internet website design service" (ANZSIC M700040).
Previous addresses
Address #1: Asb Bank Centre Level 18, 135 Albert Street, Auckland, 1010 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 03 Nov 2016 to 27 Sep 2017
Address #2: 205/2 Dockside Lane, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 21 Nov 2012 to 03 Nov 2016
Address #3: 31 Broadway, Newmarket, Auckland, 1023 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 24 Aug 2011 to 21 Nov 2012
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: August
Annual return last filed: 18 Mar 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 100 | |||
Director | Lu, Sally |
Royal Oak Auckland 1023 New Zealand |
19 Mar 2024 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Li, Yue Gui |
Auckland Central Auckland 1010 New Zealand |
24 Aug 2011 - 19 Mar 2024 |
Sally Lu - Director
Appointment date: 01 Mar 2024
Address: Royal Oak, Auckland, 1023 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Mar 2024
Yue Gui Li - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 24 Aug 2011
Termination date: 01 Mar 2024
Address: Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 New Zealand
Address used since 19 Sep 2017
Address: Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 New Zealand
Address used since 13 Nov 2012
Shot Energy Pty Limited
18 Beach Road, Scene Two Apartments
Proformance Global Solutions Limited
Unit 4a Dunningham City Apartments, 20 Wolfe Street
Dio's Trading Limited
Unit 4 18 Beach Road
John Mackay (urban Strategy) Limited
1401/18 Beach Rd
Mcer Investments Limited
1505/18 Beach Road
Vitesse Consulting Limited
Apartment 1201
Accelerated Design Limited
16 Anzac Ave
Clifton Digital Media Limited
Flat 618, 6 Dockside Lane
Kai Yue Company Limited
Unit 4, Level 1,
Kiwise Advertising Limited
1 Anzac Avenue
Satellite Media Limited
Ross Melville P K F
Webscope Limited
48 Emily Place