Jakob Limited was registered on 07 Sep 2011 and issued a New Zealand Business Number of 9429031009690. This registered LTD company has been supervised by 3 directors: Jason Tamihana Johnston - an active director whose contract started on 07 Sep 2011,
Jeffrey Ramana Boyle - an active director whose contract started on 07 Sep 2011,
Maurice Raymond Beckett - an inactive director whose contract started on 07 Sep 2011 and was terminated on 13 Jun 2017.
According to the BizDb data (updated on 26 Jul 2024), this company registered 2 addresses: Level 3 105 Hastings Street, Napier, 4110 (registered address),
Level 3 105 Hastings Street, Napier, 4110 (service address),
Level 1 112 Hastings Street, Napier, 4110 (physical address).
Up to 09 Jan 2024, Jakob Limited had been using Level 1 112 Hastings Street, Napier as their registered address.
A total of 150 shares are issued to 3 groups (4 shareholders in total). In the first group, 50 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Johnston, Jason Tamihana (a director) located at Bluff Hill, Napier postcode 4110.
The 2nd group consists of 1 shareholder, holds 33.33 per cent shares (exactly 50 shares) and includes
Boyle, Jeffrey Ramana - located at Pirimai, Napier.
The third share allotment (50 shares, 33.33%) belongs to 2 entities, namely:
Beckett, Maurice Raymond, located at Clive, Clive (an individual),
Maurice Beckett, located at Clive, Clive (a director). Jakob Limited has been classified as "Musical group operation" (ANZSIC R900130).
Previous addresses
Address #1: Level 1 112 Hastings Street, Napier, 4110 New Zealand
Registered & service address used from 31 Jan 2020 to 09 Jan 2024
Address #2: Level 2 Tourism House 64 Dickens Street, Napier, 4110 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 15 Dec 2015 to 31 Jan 2020
Address #3: 7b Hooker Avenue, Hospital Hill, Napier, 4110 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 07 Sep 2011 to 15 Dec 2015
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 150
Annual return filing month: November
Annual return last filed: 20 Dec 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Director | Johnston, Jason Tamihana |
Bluff Hill Napier 4110 New Zealand |
07 Sep 2011 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Director | Boyle, Jeffrey Ramana |
Pirimai Napier 4112 New Zealand |
07 Sep 2011 - |
Shares Allocation #3 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Individual | Beckett, Maurice Raymond |
Clive Clive 4102 New Zealand |
07 Sep 2011 - |
Director | Maurice Raymond Beckett |
Clive Clive 4102 New Zealand |
07 Sep 2011 - |
Jason Tamihana Johnston - Director
Appointment date: 07 Sep 2011
Address: Bluff Hill, Napier, 4110 New Zealand
Address used since 07 Sep 2011
Address: Bluff Hill, Napier, 4110 New Zealand
Address used since 07 Sep 2011
Jeffrey Ramana Boyle - Director
Appointment date: 07 Sep 2011
Address: Pirimai, Napier, 4112 New Zealand
Address used since 07 Sep 2011
Maurice Raymond Beckett - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 07 Sep 2011
Termination date: 13 Jun 2017
Address: Clive, Clive, 4102 New Zealand
Address used since 07 Sep 2011
Benchtops For You Limited
Level 2, 116 Vautier Street
B & N Investments Limited
Level 2, 116 Vautier Street
Current Controls Limited
Level 2, 116 Vautier Street
J K's Auto Electrical & Air Conditioning 2011 Limited
Level 2, 116 Vautier Street
South Island Logistics Limited
Shed 5, Level 1, Lever Street
Kai Muri Limited
Level 1, 15 Shakespeare Road
Bay Music Projects Limited
556 Maunganui Road
Cherry Bomb Entertainment Limited
179 Victoria Avenue
Heartland Audiology Limited
52 Collingwood Street
Mount Tauranga Enterprises Limited
32 Cameron Road
Swamp Thing Music Limited
1168 Amohia Street
Zxsound Limited
128 Hikurangi Road