Mrd Studio Limited was launched on 20 May 2011 and issued a New Zealand Business Number of 9429031091329. This registered LTD company has been run by 1 director, named Mathew Mardon Rickman - an active director whose contract started on 20 May 2011.
As stated in BizDb's data (updated on 17 Sep 2024), this company filed 1 address: Unit 1, 392 Queen Street, Masterton, Masterton, 5810 (types include: registered, service).
Until 23 Mar 2021, Mrd Studio Limited had been using 38 Bannister Street, Masterton, Masterton as their registered address.
BizDb identified other names used by this company: from 04 May 2022 to 13 May 2022 they were called Mrd Limited, from 22 Jun 2015 to 04 May 2022 they were called Flair Housing & Design Limited and from 17 May 2011 to 22 Jun 2015 they were called 4 By 2 Construction Limited.
A total of 1000 shares are issued to 2 groups (2 shareholders in total). When considering the first group, 500 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
O'brien, Ashleigh Louise (an individual) located at Lansdowne, Masterton postcode 5810.
The second group consists of 1 shareholder, holds 50% shares (exactly 500 shares) and includes
Rickman, Mathew Mardon - located at Lansdowne, Masterton. Mrd Studio Limited was categorised as "Building, house construction" (ANZSIC E301120).
Other active addresses
Address #4: Unit 1, 392 Queen Street, Masterton, Masterton, 5810 New Zealand
Registered address used from 06 May 2024
Previous addresses
Address #1: 38 Bannister Street, Masterton, Masterton, 5810 New Zealand
Registered address used from 14 Dec 2017 to 23 Mar 2021
Address #2: 8 Gimson Street, Solway, Masterton, 5810 New Zealand
Physical address used from 08 May 2013 to 20 Apr 2018
Address #3: 34 Bannister Street, Masterton, Masterton, 5810 New Zealand
Registered address used from 20 May 2011 to 14 Dec 2017
Address #4: 16 Charles Street, Carterton, 5713 New Zealand
Physical address used from 20 May 2011 to 08 May 2013
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 1000
Annual return filing month: April
Annual return last filed: 26 Apr 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 500 | |||
Individual | O'brien, Ashleigh Louise |
Lansdowne Masterton 5810 New Zealand |
20 May 2011 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 500 | |||
Director | Rickman, Mathew Mardon |
Lansdowne Masterton 5810 New Zealand |
20 May 2011 - |
Mathew Mardon Rickman - Director
Appointment date: 20 May 2011
Address: Lansdowne, Masterton, 5810 New Zealand
Address used since 11 Feb 2023
Address: Solway, Masterton, 5810 New Zealand
Address used since 12 Apr 2018
Address: Solway, Masterton, 5810 New Zealand
Address used since 30 Apr 2013
Yoda Trustees Limited
38 Bannister Street
Healthhub247 Limited
38 Bannister Street
Top Brush Chimney Cleaning Limited
38 Bannister Street
The Corner (2012) Limited
38 Bannister Street
John Stevenson Farming Limited
38 Bannister Street
Rongomai Station Limited
38 Bannister Street
A Bruce Builder Limited
38 Bannister Street
Buick Building Limited
34 Bannister Street
Concept Construction 2010 Limited
34 Bannister Street
Timeless Construction Limited
38 Bannister Street
Villa Services Nz Limited
38 Bannister Street
Woodpeck Industries Limited
38 Bannister Street