Calc 2020 Limited was started on 05 May 2011 and issued a number of 9429031110822. This registered LTD company has been run by 3 directors: Timothy James Woodhead - an active director whose contract started on 05 May 2011,
Stuart Robert Caldwell - an inactive director whose contract started on 05 May 2011 and was terminated on 30 Sep 2014,
Barry David Levesque - an inactive director whose contract started on 05 May 2011 and was terminated on 30 Sep 2014.
As stated in BizDb's database (updated on 20 Aug 2024), the company registered 2 addresses: 100B Hackthorne Road, Cashmere, Christchurch, 8022 (registered address),
100B Hackthorne Road, Cashmere, Christchurch, 8022 (service address),
40 Leeds Street, Phillipstown, Christchurch, 8011 (physical address).
Until 07 Jun 2024, Calc 2020 Limited had been using 100B Hackthorne Road, Cashmere, Christchurch as their registered address.
BizDb identified past names used by the company: from 05 May 2011 to 31 Aug 2020 they were called C & L Canterbury Limited, from 03 May 2011 to 05 May 2011 they were called Caldwell & Levesque Canterbury Limited.
A total of 1000 shares are allocated to 1 group (3 shareholders in total). When considering the first group, 1000 shares are held by 3 entities, namely:
Woodhead, Moira Anne Sylvia (an individual) located at Cashmere, Christchurch postcode 8022,
Woodhead Trustees Limited (an entity) located at Ellerslie, Auckland postcode 1051,
Woodhead, Timothy James (a director) located at Cashmere, Christchurch postcode 8022. Calc 2020 Limited is categorised as "Electrical services" (business classification E323220).
Previous addresses
Address #1: 100b Hackthorne Road, Cashmere, Christchurch, 8022 New Zealand
Registered & service address used from 06 Jun 2024 to 07 Jun 2024
Address #2: 40 Leeds Street, Phillipstown, Christchurch, 8011 New Zealand
Registered & service address used from 05 Aug 2016 to 06 Jun 2024
Address #3: Level 2, 5-7 Kingdon Street, Newmarket, Auckland, 1023 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 20 May 2015 to 05 Aug 2016
Address #4: Level 4, 5-7 Kingdon Street, Newmarket, Auckland, 1023 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 04 Jan 2012 to 20 May 2015
Address #5: Level 2, 123 Carlton Gore Road, Newmarket, Auckland, 1023 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 05 May 2011 to 04 Jan 2012
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 1000
Annual return filing month: May
Annual return last filed: 28 May 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 1000 | |||
Individual | Woodhead, Moira Anne Sylvia |
Cashmere Christchurch 8022 New Zealand |
26 Nov 2019 - |
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Woodhead Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429031473408 |
Ellerslie Auckland 1051 New Zealand |
26 Nov 2019 - |
Director | Woodhead, Timothy James |
Cashmere Christchurch 8022 New Zealand |
26 Nov 2019 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Levesque, Barry David |
Mount Albert Auckland 1025 New Zealand |
01 Dec 2014 - 01 Dec 2014 |
Entity | Caldwell & Levesque Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429031225984 Company Number: 3263070 |
Newmarket Auckland 1023 New Zealand |
01 Dec 2014 - 26 Nov 2019 |
Individual | Caldwell, Stuart Robert |
Remuera Auckland 1050 New Zealand |
01 Dec 2014 - 01 Dec 2014 |
Individual | Levesque, Suzanne |
Mount Albert Auckland 1025 New Zealand |
01 Dec 2014 - 01 Dec 2014 |
Individual | Caldwell, Sarah |
Remuera Auckland 1050 New Zealand |
01 Dec 2014 - 01 Dec 2014 |
Entity | C&l Group Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429035993254 Company Number: 1301742 |
05 May 2011 - 01 Dec 2014 | |
Entity | C&l Group Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429035993254 Company Number: 1301742 |
05 May 2011 - 01 Dec 2014 | |
Entity | Caldwell & Levesque Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429031225984 Company Number: 3263070 |
Newmarket Auckland 1023 New Zealand |
01 Dec 2014 - 26 Nov 2019 |
Timothy James Woodhead - Director
Appointment date: 05 May 2011
Address: Cashmere, Christchurch, 8022 New Zealand
Address used since 05 Aug 2016
Stuart Robert Caldwell - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 05 May 2011
Termination date: 30 Sep 2014
Address: Remuera, Auckland, 1050 New Zealand
Address used since 05 May 2011
Barry David Levesque - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 05 May 2011
Termination date: 30 Sep 2014
Address: Northcote, Auckland, 0627 New Zealand
Address used since 15 May 2014
Dr Collision Limited
43 Leeds Street
Ninja Gnome Limited
87 Park Hill Road
Mantell Investments 2 Limited
181 Ferry Road
Mainland Taxis Limited
160 Ferry Road
Blue Star Taxis Canterbury Limited
160 Ferry Road
Ashbec Trading Limited
12 Phillips Street
All Solutions Electrical Limited
444 St Asaph Street
Dshackle Industries Limited
3/20 Grenville Street
Electro-tech Services Limited
80 Thackeray Street
Light It Up Electrical Limited
176 Fitzgerald Avenue
Mbe Electrical Limited
2/87 Grafton St
Sheat Electrical Limited
6 Lancaster Street