Canform Structures Limited was registered on 02 May 2011 and issued a business number of 9429031129510. This registered LTD company has been run by 3 directors: Simon James Geary - an active director whose contract began on 02 May 2011,
Emma Twaddell - an inactive director whose contract began on 10 Mar 2020 and was terminated on 24 Apr 2020,
Brent Richard Jordaan - an inactive director whose contract began on 02 May 2011 and was terminated on 18 Jan 2012.
According to BizDb's information (updated on 16 Aug 2024), this company registered 1 address: 15 Pukeko Place, Southshore, Christchurch, 8062 (types include: registered, physical).
Until 08 Mar 2022, Canform Structures Limited had been using 25 Courtenay Street, St Albans, Christchurch as their registered address.
A total of 8000 shares are allocated to 1 group (1 sole shareholder). When considering the first group, 8000 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Geary, Simon James (a director) located at Southshore, Christchurch postcode 8062. Canform Structures Limited is classified as "Bridge construction or repair" (ANZSIC E310130).
Principal place of activity
25 Courtenay Street, St Albans, Christchurch, 8014 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: 25 Courtenay Street, St Albans, Christchurch, 8014 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 07 Sep 2020 to 08 Mar 2022
Address #2: Level 1, 62 Riccarton Road, Christchurch, 8011 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 16 Jul 2020 to 07 Sep 2020
Address #3: 25 Mandeville Street, Riccarton, Christchurch, 8011 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 30 Oct 2019 to 16 Jul 2020
Address #4: Level 1, 176 High Street, Rangiora, 7400 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 22 Nov 2018 to 30 Oct 2019
Address #5: 14 Mathias Street, Saint Albans, Christchurch, 8052 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 17 May 2012 to 22 Nov 2018
Address #6: 25 Courtenay Street, Saint Albans, Christchurch, 8014 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 02 May 2011 to 17 May 2012
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 8000
Annual return filing month: September
Annual return last filed: 23 Nov 2020
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 8000 | |||
Director | Geary, Simon James |
Southshore Christchurch 8062 New Zealand |
02 May 2011 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Twaddell, Emma Louise |
Saint Albans Christchurch 8014 New Zealand |
23 May 2012 - 28 Feb 2022 |
Director | Brent Richard Jordaan |
Ilam Christchurch 8041 New Zealand |
02 May 2011 - 09 May 2012 |
Individual | Jordaan, Brent Richard |
Ilam Christchurch 8041 New Zealand |
02 May 2011 - 09 May 2012 |
Simon James Geary - Director
Appointment date: 02 May 2011
Address: Southshore, Christchurch, 8062 New Zealand
Address: Saint Albans, Christchurch, 8014 New Zealand
Emma Twaddell - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 10 Mar 2020
Termination date: 24 Apr 2020
Address: St Albans, Christchurch, 8014 New Zealand
Address used since 10 Mar 2020
Brent Richard Jordaan - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 02 May 2011
Termination date: 18 Jan 2012
Address: Ilam, Christchurch, 8041 New Zealand
Address used since 02 May 2011
Drifter Stretch Tents Limited
14 Mathias Street
Dvm Contracting And Painting Limited
14 Mathias Street
Ditta Logistics Limited
14 Mathias Street
C R Taylor Plastering Limited
14 Mathias Street
Surefreeze Appliances Limited
14 Mathias Street
Waipara Brick And Block Limited
14 Mathias Street
Bailey Civil Limited
10 Wicksteed Street
Edifice Contracts Limited
35-39 Tiro Tiro Rd
Quigley's Farm Bridges Limited
478 Wilton Collieries Road
Riverside Developments Limited
Main Road South
Select Bridges (2017) Limited
53-61 Whitaker Street
Specialized Workforce Limited
Suite 1, 314 Maunganui Road