Dac Miller Trustee Limited was registered on 23 Mar 2011 and issued a New Zealand Business Number of 9429031169745. This registered LTD company has been managed by 6 directors: John Baird Campbell - an active director whose contract began on 23 Mar 2011,
Bodee Rutherford Oliver - an active director whose contract began on 09 May 2016,
Bridie Susan Tippett - an active director whose contract began on 09 May 2016,
Juliet Louise Helene Van Der Oord - an inactive director whose contract began on 23 Mar 2011 and was terminated on 30 Apr 2019,
Bridget Georgina Chrystall - an inactive director whose contract began on 23 Mar 2011 and was terminated on 16 Sep 2014.
As stated in BizDb's data (updated on 17 Jul 2024), this company registered 1 address: 9 Herbert Street, Waipukurau, Waipukurau, 4200 (type: physical, registered).
A total of 100 shares are allocated to 1 group (1 sole shareholder). In the first group, 100 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Dac Legal (2019) Limited (an entity) located at Waipukurau, Waipukurau postcode 4200. Dac Miller Trustee Limited has been categorised as "Trustee service" (ANZSIC K641965).
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: March
Annual return last filed: 06 Mar 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 100 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Dac Legal (2019) Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429047277861 |
Waipukurau Waipukurau 4200 New Zealand |
22 Jul 2019 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Chrystall, Bridget Georgina |
Rd 2 Ongaonga 4279 New Zealand |
23 Mar 2011 - 02 Oct 2014 |
Individual | Van Der Oord, Juliet Louise Helene |
Rd 7 Dannevirke 4977 New Zealand |
23 Mar 2011 - 22 Jul 2019 |
Individual | Hamilton, Hugh Edward Staples |
Waipukurau Waipukurau 4200 New Zealand |
23 Mar 2011 - 10 Aug 2011 |
Director | Campbell, John Baird |
Rd 1 Waipukurau 4281 New Zealand |
23 Mar 2011 - 22 Jul 2019 |
Director | Hugh Edward Staples Hamilton |
Waipukurau Waipukurau 4200 New Zealand |
23 Mar 2011 - 10 Aug 2011 |
Director | Bridget Georgina Chrystall |
Rd 2 Ongaonga 4279 New Zealand |
23 Mar 2011 - 02 Oct 2014 |
John Baird Campbell - Director
Appointment date: 23 Mar 2011
Address: Rd 1, Waipukurau, 4281 New Zealand
Address used since 23 Mar 2011
Bodee Rutherford Oliver - Director
Appointment date: 09 May 2016
Address: Waipukurau, Waipukurau, 4200 New Zealand
Address used since 22 Jun 2018
Address: Waipukurau, Waipukurau, 4200 New Zealand
Address used since 09 May 2016
Bridie Susan Tippett - Director
Appointment date: 09 May 2016
Address: Waipukurau, Waipukurau, 4200 New Zealand
Address used since 09 May 2016
Address: Rd 2, Waipukurau, 4282 New Zealand
Address used since 06 Oct 2018
Juliet Louise Helene Van Der Oord - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 23 Mar 2011
Termination date: 30 Apr 2019
Address: Rd 7, Dannevirke, 4977 New Zealand
Address used since 23 Mar 2011
Bridget Georgina Chrystall - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 23 Mar 2011
Termination date: 16 Sep 2014
Address: Rd 2, Ongaonga, 4279 New Zealand
Address used since 23 Mar 2011
Hugh Edward Staples Hamilton - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 23 Mar 2011
Termination date: 30 Jun 2011
Address: Waipukurau, Waipukurau, 4200 New Zealand
Address used since 23 Mar 2011
Dac Mcnutt Trustee Limited
9 Herbert Street
Dac Trustees 2013 Limited
9 Herbert Street
Dac Jones Trustee Limited
9 Herbert Street
Te Manga Trustees Limited
9 Herbert Street
Stothart Trustees Limited
9 Herbert Street
Dac Train Trustee Limited
9 Herbert Street
Chb Gay Trustee Limited
9 Herbert Street
Chb Lanauze Trustee Limited
9 Herbert Street
Chb Trustees No 3 Limited
9 Herbert Street
Dac Jones Trustee Limited
9 Herbert Street
Dac Mcnutt Trustee Limited
9 Herbert Street
Dac Trustees 2013 Limited
9 Herbert Street