Ardroy Farm Limited was started on 11 Mar 2011 and issued a business number of 9429031189187. The registered LTD company has been managed by 3 directors: Simon Stuart Greer - an active director whose contract began on 11 Mar 2011,
Patricia Grace Greer - an active director whose contract began on 11 Mar 2011,
John Acheson Greer - an active director whose contract began on 11 Mar 2011.
According to our information (last updated on 10 Aug 2024), this company uses 1 address: 173 Spey Street, Invercargill, 9810 (type: physical, registered).
Up until 24 Mar 2020, Ardroy Farm Limited had been using 173 Spey Street, Invercargill as their registered address.
A total of 120 shares are allotted to 4 groups (4 shareholders in total). In the first group, 10 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Greer, John Acheson (a director) located at Ardroy, Rd 1, Otautau postcode 9689.
The 2nd group consists of 1 shareholder, holds 8.33 per cent shares (exactly 10 shares) and includes
Greer, Patricia Grace - located at Ardroy, Rd 1, Otautau.
The third share allocation (10 shares, 8.33%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Greer, Susannah Kate, located at Rd 1, Otautau (an individual).
Previous addresses
Address: 173 Spey Street, Invercargill, 9810 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 31 Mar 2015 to 24 Mar 2020
Address: Crowe Horwath (nz) Limited, 173 Spey Street, Invercargill, 9810 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 27 Mar 2014 to 31 Mar 2015
Address: Whk South, 173 Spey Street, Invercargill, 9810 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 10 Apr 2012 to 27 Mar 2014
Address: 62 Deveron Street, Invercargill, 9810 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 11 Mar 2011 to 10 Apr 2012
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 120
Annual return filing month: March
Annual return last filed: 24 Mar 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 10 | |||
Director | Greer, John Acheson |
Ardroy, Rd 1 Otautau 9689 New Zealand |
11 Mar 2011 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 10 | |||
Director | Greer, Patricia Grace |
Ardroy, Rd 1 Otautau 9689 New Zealand |
11 Mar 2011 - |
Shares Allocation #3 Number of Shares: 10 | |||
Individual | Greer, Susannah Kate |
Rd 1 Otautau 9689 New Zealand |
23 Dec 2016 - |
Shares Allocation #4 Number of Shares: 90 | |||
Director | Greer, Simon Stuart |
Rd 1 Otautau 9689 New Zealand |
11 Mar 2011 - |
Simon Stuart Greer - Director
Appointment date: 11 Mar 2011
Address: Rd 1, Otautau, 9689 New Zealand
Address used since 11 Mar 2011
Patricia Grace Greer - Director
Appointment date: 11 Mar 2011
Address: Ardroy, Rd 1, Otautau, 9689 New Zealand
Address used since 11 Mar 2011
John Acheson Greer - Director
Appointment date: 11 Mar 2011
Address: Ardroy, Rd 1, Otautau, 9689 New Zealand
Address used since 11 Mar 2011
Schist Holdings Limited
173 Spey Street
Northern Southland Engineering Limited
173 Spey Street
Symonds Street Trust Services Limited
173 Spey Street
Turntru Machining Limited
173 Spey Street
N J Architectural Design Limited
173 Spey Street
Ronaki (southland) Limited
173 Spey Street