Inggs Trustee Limited, a registered company, was started on 16 Feb 2011. 9429031213523 is the number it was issued. "Investment - financial assets" (ANZSIC K624040) is how the company has been categorised. This company has been managed by 2 directors: Andrew Dalziel - an active director whose contract started on 16 Oct 2017,
Lianne Sheryl Meyer - an inactive director whose contract started on 16 Feb 2011 and was terminated on 16 Oct 2017.
Updated on 14 Aug 2024, the BizDb database contains detailed information about 1 address: 115 Turner Road, Rd 4, Whakamarama, 3181 (type: registered, physical).
Inggs Trustee Limited had been using 892 Beach Road, Waiake, Auckland as their physical address up until 15 Oct 2021.
One entity owns all company shares (exactly 2 shares) - Dalziel, Andrew - located at 3181, Karaka Bays, Wellington.
Principal place of activity
892 Beach Road, Waiake, Auckland, 0630 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address: 892 Beach Road, Waiake, Auckland, 0630 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 12 Dec 2018 to 15 Oct 2021
Address: Unit D2, 27-29 William Pickering Drive, Albany, Auckland, 0632 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 16 Feb 2011 to 12 Dec 2018
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 2
Annual return filing month: September
Annual return last filed: 06 Sep 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 2 | |||
Individual | Dalziel, Andrew |
Karaka Bays Wellington 6022 New Zealand |
17 Oct 2017 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Williams, Ricky Allan |
Albany Auckland 0632 New Zealand |
16 Feb 2011 - 17 Oct 2017 |
Individual | Meyer, Lianne Sheryl |
Albany Auckland 0632 New Zealand |
16 Feb 2011 - 17 Oct 2017 |
Director | Lianne Sheryl Meyer |
Albany Auckland 0632 New Zealand |
16 Feb 2011 - 17 Oct 2017 |
Andrew Dalziel - Director
Appointment date: 16 Oct 2017
Address: Karaka Bays, Wellington, 6022 New Zealand
Address used since 16 Oct 2017
Lianne Sheryl Meyer - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 16 Feb 2011
Termination date: 16 Oct 2017
Address: Albany, Auckland, 0632 New Zealand
Address used since 16 Feb 2011
Carewell Health Pty Ltd
27c William Pickering Drive
Staah Limited
Unit F3, 27-29 William Pickering Drive
Large Family Holdings Limited
27c William Pickering Drive,
Mmz Associates Limited
27c William Pickering Drive
Global Martial Arts Nz Limited
A2, 27 William Pickering Drive
Proactive Safety Management Limited
27c William Pickering Drive
Baltic Holdings Limited
Unit 7a
Conset Investments Limited
7 Te Kea Place
Gmh Holdings Limited
27c William Pickering Drive
St Andrews Trustee Company Limited
Unit D2 27 - 29 William Pickering Street
Ultimate Products Nz Limited
32/d William Pickering Drive
Warin Investments Limited
106 Bush Road