Pegasus Sports Limited was started on 29 Sep 2010 and issued an NZ business identifier of 9429031369657. This registered LTD company has been run by 2 directors: Andrew Benjamin Falck - an active director whose contract began on 29 Sep 2010,
Andrew Falck - an active director whose contract began on 29 Sep 2010.
As stated in BizDb's data (updated on 21 Aug 2024), this company uses 4 addresses: 45 Kingsbridge West, Burwood, Christchurch, 8083 (postal address),
45 Kingsbridge West, Burwood, Christchurch, 8083 (office address),
45 Kingsbridge West, Burwood, Christchurch, 8083 (delivery address),
45 Kingsbridge West, Burwood, Christchurch, 8083 (registered address) among others.
Until 03 Nov 2017, Pegasus Sports Limited had been using 27 Achilles Street, Burwood, Christchurch as their physical address.
A total of 10 shares are allocated to 1 group (1 sole shareholder). When considering the first group, 10 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Falck, Andrew Benjamin (an individual) located at Burwood, Christchurch postcode 8083. Pegasus Sports Limited was categorised as "Sports administration service - tennis" (business classification R911485).
Other active addresses
Address #4: 45 Kingsbridge West, Burwood, Christchurch, 8083 New Zealand
Postal & office & delivery address used from 21 Oct 2019
Principal place of activity
45 Kingsbridge West, Burwood, Christchurch, 8083 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: 27 Achilles Street, Burwood, Christchurch, 8061 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 05 Nov 2015 to 03 Nov 2017
Address #2: 42 Titirangi Crescent, Parklands, Christchurch, 8083 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 09 Oct 2012 to 05 Nov 2015
Address #3: 47c Birchfield Avenue, Dallington, Christchurch, 8061 New Zealand
Physical address used from 19 Oct 2011 to 09 Oct 2012
Address #4: Flat 5, 11 Sherborne Street, Saint Albans, Christchurch, 8014 New Zealand
Registered address used from 29 Sep 2010 to 09 Oct 2012
Address #5: 71 Dunair Drive, Burwood, Christchurch, 8083 New Zealand
Physical address used from 29 Sep 2010 to 19 Oct 2011
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 10
Annual return filing month: October
Annual return last filed: 30 Oct 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 10 | |||
Individual | Falck, Andrew Benjamin |
Burwood Christchurch 8083 New Zealand |
02 Mar 2021 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Director | Falck, Andrew |
Burwood Christchurch 8083 New Zealand |
29 Sep 2010 - 02 Mar 2021 |
Andrew Benjamin Falck - Director
Appointment date: 29 Sep 2010
Address: Burwood, Christchurch, 8083 New Zealand
Address used since 26 Oct 2017
Andrew Falck - Director
Appointment date: 29 Sep 2010
Address: Burwood, Christchurch, 8061 New Zealand
Address used since 20 Feb 2015
Address: Burwood, Christchurch, 8083 New Zealand
Address used since 26 Oct 2017
Walker Prestige Limited
87 Travis Country Drive
Be The Change Nz/kia Tu Hurihanga Aotearoa
3 Excalibur Place
Sullivan And Sons Limited
2 Excalibur Place
Faith Restoration Centre
10 Istana Place
Burwood Congregation Of Jehovah's Witnesses, Christchurch
22 St Keverne Close
Kuran (nz) Limited
17 Excalibur Place
Meredith Brothers Tennis Coaching Limited
148 Barrington Street
Southern Elite Tennis Limited
Level 8, Pencarrow House
Top Electrical Services Limited
108l Colwill Road