Urban Trends (Nz) Limited was registered on 03 Nov 2009 and issued a number of 9429031812603. This removed LTD company has been managed by 7 directors: Struan Andrew Kingan - an active director whose contract started on 03 Nov 2009,
Andrew Neil Mcclune - an active director whose contract started on 03 Nov 2009,
Struan Kingan - an active director whose contract started on 03 Nov 2009,
Andrew Mcclune - an active director whose contract started on 03 Nov 2009,
Neil Raymond Plummer - an inactive director whose contract started on 01 Oct 2011 and was terminated on 14 Dec 2015.
As stated in BizDb's database (updated on 19 May 2024), this company filed 1 address: Po Box 5743, Victoria Street West, Auckland, 1142 (type: postal, office).
BizDb identified more names used by this company: from 01 Apr 2010 to 01 Apr 2010 they were named Urban Leisure No. 2 Limited, from 03 Nov 2009 to 01 Apr 2010 they were named Urban Leisure Limited.
A total of 100 shares are issued to 1 group (1 sole shareholder). In the first group, 100 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Macvad Limited (an entity) located at Birkenhead, Auckland. Urban Trends (Nz) Limited has been classified as "Sales agent for manufacturer or wholesaler" (ANZSIC F380050).
Principal place of activity
39 Rawene Road, Birkenhead, Auckland, 0626 New Zealand
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: July
Annual return last filed: 03 Jul 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 100 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Macvad Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429035260240 |
Birkenhead Auckland |
03 Nov 2009 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Ballard, Melanie Jill |
Belmont Auckland 0622 New Zealand |
17 Oct 2011 - 19 Dec 2014 |
Individual | Gomes, Virginia Louise |
Belmont Auckland 0622 New Zealand |
17 Oct 2011 - 19 Dec 2014 |
Ultimate Holding Company
Struan Andrew Kingan - Director
Appointment date: 03 Nov 2009
Address: Remuera, Auckland, 1050 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Jun 2019
Address: Remuera, Auckland, 1050 New Zealand
Address used since 16 Feb 2017
Andrew Neil Mcclune - Director
Appointment date: 03 Nov 2009
Address: Hauraki, Auckland, 0622 New Zealand
Address used since 19 Jul 2019
Address: Takapuna, Auckland, 0622 New Zealand
Address used since 13 Jul 2015
Struan Kingan - Director
Appointment date: 03 Nov 2009
Address: Remuera, Auckland, 1050 New Zealand
Address used since 16 Feb 2017
Andrew Mcclune - Director
Appointment date: 03 Nov 2009
Address: Takapuna, Auckland, 0622 New Zealand
Address used since 13 Jul 2015
Neil Raymond Plummer - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 01 Oct 2011
Termination date: 14 Dec 2015
Address: Huia, Auckland, 0604 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Oct 2011
Andrew James Spencer - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 01 Oct 2011
Termination date: 14 Dec 2015
Address: Herne Bay, Auckland, 1011 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Oct 2011
Melanie Jill Ballard - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 01 Oct 2011
Termination date: 19 Dec 2014
Address: Belmont, Auckland, 0622 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Oct 2011
Segno Safety (nz) Limited
39 Rawene Road
Macvad South Africa Limited
39 Rawene Road
Katie Elizabeth Plowman Trust Limited
39 Rawene Road
Macvad (canada Usa) Limited
39 Rawene Road
Maureen Plowman No. 2 Trust Limited
39 Rawene Road
Macvad Limited
39 Rawene Road
Bluewhale Marketing Services & Consultants Limited
1/266-268 Onewa Road
Bountygate (nz) Limited
16b Maunganui Road
Chemlube Solutions Limited
6c Waratah Street
Glz Trading Limited
Flat 1, 15 Zion Road
Macvad (canada Usa) Limited
39 Rawene Road
Macvad Limited
39 Rawene Road