Waimanu Views Limited, a registered company, was started on 15 Sep 2009. 9429031918275 is the NZ business number it was issued. "Rental of residential property" (ANZSIC L671160) is how the company is categorised. The company has been managed by 2 directors: Timothy William Scholes - an active director whose contract started on 15 Sep 2009,
Anna Margaret Petherick - an active director whose contract started on 18 Feb 2021.
Updated on 11 Oct 2023, our database contains detailed information about 3 addresses this company registered, specifically: 54 Settlers Grove, Orewa, Orewa, 0931 (registered address),
54 Settlers Grove, Orewa, Orewa, 0931 (physical address),
54 Settlers Grove, Orewa, Orewa, 0931 (service address),
54 Settlers Grove, Orewa, Orewa, 0931 (other address) among others.
Waimanu Views Limited had been using 7 Marewa Place, Waikanae Beach, Waikanae as their physical address up to 18 Nov 2019.
A total of 100 shares are allotted to 2 shareholders (2 groups). The first group includes 1 share (1%) held by 1 entity. Next we have the second group which includes 1 shareholder in control of 99 shares (99%).
Previous addresses
Address #1: 7 Marewa Place, Waikanae Beach, Waikanae, 5036 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 20 Nov 2012 to 18 Nov 2019
Address #2: 54 Seychelles Drive, Papamoa New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 15 Sep 2009 to 20 Nov 2012
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: November
Annual return last filed: 11 Nov 2022
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 1 | |||
Individual | Petherick, Anna Margaret |
Orewa Orewa 0931 New Zealand |
09 Feb 2021 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 99 | |||
Individual | Scholes, Timothy William |
Orewa Orewa 0931 New Zealand |
15 Sep 2009 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Petherick, Anna |
Orewa 0931 New Zealand |
09 Feb 2021 - 09 Feb 2021 |
Timothy William Scholes - Director
Appointment date: 15 Sep 2009
Address: Orewa, Orewa, 0931 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Apr 2019
Address: Waikanae Beach, Waikanae, 5036 New Zealand
Address used since 10 Nov 2012
Anna Margaret Petherick - Director
Appointment date: 18 Feb 2021
Address: Orewa, Orewa, 0931 New Zealand
Address used since 18 Feb 2021
Board Of Trust Of The Word Of God
2 Marewa Place
Towards Tomorrow Limited
9 Barrett Drive
End-of-life Choice Society Of New Zealand Incorporated
4 Pio Pio Place
Mobile Drycleaning Limited
27 Barrett Drive
Hrs Peoplesearch Limited
4 Te Ropata Place
Peoplesearch Consulting Limited
4 Te Ropata Place
Castagnola Holdings Limited
183 Tutere Street
Karson Corp Limited
14 Kennedy Place
Philbridge Limited
16 Oratia Street
Pieters Properties Limited
8 Sunset Terrace
Propit Limited
166 Weggery Drive
Trusco Rephil Limited
189 Tutere Street