Maden Builders Limited, a registered company, was launched on 21 Sep 2009. 9429031942867 is the NZBN it was issued. "Building installation services nec" (business classification E323925) is how the company is categorised. This company has been managed by 3 directors: Mark Mckinnon Skachill - an active director whose contract started on 21 Sep 2009,
Helen Novak - an inactive director whose contract started on 21 Sep 2009 and was terminated on 16 Jul 2010,
Jaden Barrie Walker - an inactive director whose contract started on 21 Sep 2009 and was terminated on 25 Jan 2010.
Last updated on 01 Jun 2020, our database contains detailed information about 1 address: 23 Matuku Place, Paraparaumu, Paraparaumu, 5032 (types include: registered, physical).
Maden Builders Limited had been using 1 Matuku Place, Paraparaumu as their physical address up until 28 Jul 2015.
A total of 100 shares are issued to 2 shareholders (2 groups). The first group is comprised of 98 shares (98 per cent) held by 1 entity. There is also a second group which consists of 1 shareholder in control of 2 shares (2 per cent).
Previous address
Address: 1 Matuku Place, Paraparaumu New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 21 Sep 2009 to 28 Jul 2015
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: August
Annual return last filed: 09 Sep 2019
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 98 | |||
Individual | Mark Mckinnon Skachill |
Casebrook Christchurch 8051 New Zealand |
21 Sep 2009 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 2 | |||
Individual | Helen Novak |
Paraparaumu Beach Paraparaumu 5032 New Zealand |
21 Sep 2009 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Jaden Barrie Walker |
Otaihanga Paraparaumu |
21 Sep 2009 - 27 Jun 2010 |
Mark Mckinnon Skachill - Director
Appointment date: 21 Sep 2009
Address: Casebrook, Christchurch, 8051 New Zealand
Address used since 02 Sep 2015
Helen Novak - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 21 Sep 2009
Termination date: 16 Jul 2010
Address: Paraparaumu Beach, New Zealand
Address used since 21 Sep 2009
Jaden Barrie Walker - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 21 Sep 2009
Termination date: 25 Jan 2010
Address: Otaihanga, Paraparaumu, New Zealand
Address used since 21 Sep 2009
Centurian Homes Limited
23 Matuku Place
Jbw Construction Limited
23 Matuku Place
Helpet Holdings 2014 Limited
23 Matuku Place
Dysan And Associates Limited
23 Matuku Place
Apn Construction Limited
23 Matuku Place
Helpet Trading Limited
23 Matuku Place
Braddock & Co Limited
52 Black Beeck Street
Hughes Applied Technology Limited
50 Ngarara Road
Just Home Maintenance Limited
46 He Awa Crescent
Qbec Limited
38 Bodmin Terrace
Security Maintenance Specialists Limited
30 Raukawa Road
Tintsafe Wgtn Limited
8 Streets Way