Lockwood Investments Limited was launched on 15 Jul 2009 and issued an NZ business identifier of 9429032157635. This registered LTD company has been managed by 3 directors: Susan Catherine Lockwood - an active director whose contract began on 15 Jul 2009,
Rowan Douglas Lockwood - an inactive director whose contract began on 08 Apr 2019 and was terminated on 25 Jun 2021,
Robert Leo Lockwood - an inactive director whose contract began on 15 Jul 2009 and was terminated on 25 May 2016.
According to BizDb's data (updated on 14 Aug 2024), this company registered 1 address: 7 Matai Road, Greenlane, Auckland, 1051 (types include: physical, registered).
Up until 02 Jun 2016, Lockwood Investments Limited had been using Level 1, 171 Hobson Street, Auckland as their physical address.
A total of 100 shares are allocated to 1 group (1 sole shareholder). When considering the first group, 100 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Lockwood, Susan Catherine (an individual) located at Greenlane, Auckland 1051.
Principal place of activity
7 Matai Road, Greenlane, Auckland, 1051 New Zealand
Previous address
Address: Level 1, 171 Hobson Street, Auckland, 1010 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 15 Jul 2009 to 02 Jun 2016
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: June
Annual return last filed: 05 Jun 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 100 | |||
Individual | Lockwood, Susan Catherine |
Greenlane Auckland 1051 |
15 Jul 2009 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Lockwood, Robert Leo |
Greenlane Auckland 1051 |
15 Jul 2009 - 25 May 2016 |
Susan Catherine Lockwood - Director
Appointment date: 15 Jul 2009
Address: Greenlane, Auckland, 1051 New Zealand
Address used since 15 Jul 2009
Rowan Douglas Lockwood - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 08 Apr 2019
Termination date: 25 Jun 2021
Address: Pukekohe, 2679 New Zealand
Address used since 08 Apr 2019
Robert Leo Lockwood - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 15 Jul 2009
Termination date: 25 May 2016
Address: Greenlane, Auckland, 1051 New Zealand
Address used since 15 Jul 2009
Number One Print Management Limited
9 Matai Road
M & C International Limited
6 Matai Road
New Zealand Stephany Holdings Limited
4 Matai Road
Atarangi Consulting Limited
16 B Atarangi Road
Saudara Property Investment Limited
16a Atarangi Road
Nv Armani Limited
253 Great South Road