Pioneer Projects Limited was registered on 28 Apr 2009 and issued a business number of 9429032316896. The registered LTD company has been managed by 2 directors: Derek Williams - an active director whose contract started on 28 Apr 2009,
Rachel Williams - an active director whose contract started on 18 Oct 2009.
As stated in BizDb's information (last updated on 19 Sep 2024), the company uses 1 address: 14 Lacebark Lane, Rd 1, Upper Moutere, 7173 (type: delivery, physical).
Until 17 Nov 2020, Pioneer Projects Limited had been using 14 Clipper Place, Shelly Park, Auckland as their physical address.
A total of 100 shares are allotted to 2 groups (2 shareholders in total). In the first group, 25 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Williams, Rachel (an individual) located at Lacebark Lane, Upper Moutere postcode 7173.
Another group consists of 1 shareholder, holds 75% shares (exactly 75 shares) and includes
Williams, Derek - located at Lacebark Lane, Upper Moutere. Pioneer Projects Limited is classified as "Computer consultancy service" (business classification M700010).
Other active addresses
Address #4: 14 Lacebark Lane, Rd 1, Upper Moutere, 7173 New Zealand
Delivery address used from 07 Sep 2021
Principal place of activity
14 Lacebark Lane, Rd 1, Upper Moutere, 7173 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: 14 Clipper Place, Shelly Park, Auckland, 2014 New Zealand
Physical address used from 12 Sep 2018 to 17 Nov 2020
Address #2: 14 Clipper Place, Shelly Park, Auckland, 2014 New Zealand
Registered address used from 13 Sep 2017 to 02 Oct 2019
Address #3: 22 Clipper Place, Shelly Park, Auckland, 2014 New Zealand
Physical address used from 02 Oct 2014 to 12 Sep 2018
Address #4: 22 Clipper Place, Shelly Park, Auckland, 2014 New Zealand
Registered address used from 02 Oct 2014 to 13 Sep 2017
Address #5: 137 Pah Road, Cockle Bay, Auckland, 2014 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 11 Sep 2012 to 02 Oct 2014
Address #6: 31 Multose Drive, Flat Bush, Auckland, 2016 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 15 Sep 2011 to 11 Sep 2012
Address #7: 59 Drake Street, Howick, Manukau, Auckland 2014 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 23 Oct 2009 to 15 Sep 2011
Address #8: 74 Gibraltar Street, Howick, Auckland, 2014
Physical & registered address used from 28 Apr 2009 to 23 Oct 2009
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: September
Annual return last filed: 02 Sep 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 25 | |||
Individual | Williams, Rachel |
Lacebark Lane Upper Moutere 7173 New Zealand |
18 Oct 2009 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 75 | |||
Individual | Williams, Derek |
Lacebark Lane Upper Moutere 7173 New Zealand |
28 Apr 2009 - |
Derek Williams - Director
Appointment date: 28 Apr 2009
Address: Shelly Park, Auckland, 2014 New Zealand
Address used since 02 Sep 2014
Address: Shelly Park, Auckland, 2014 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Sep 2017
Address: Rd 1, Upper Moutere, 7173 New Zealand
Address used since 14 Aug 2019
Rachel Williams - Director
Appointment date: 18 Oct 2009
Address: Rd 1, Upper Moutere, 7173 New Zealand
Address used since 13 Aug 2019
Address: Shelly Park, Auckland, 2014 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Sep 2014
Address: Shelly Park, Auckland, 2014 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Sep 2017
Ginger Frog Marketing Limited
18 Clipper Place
Orzel Industries Limited
26 Clipper Place
Dee Dee Fowler Investments Limited
15 Clipper Place
4ollie Limited
9 Clipper Place
Ollie Properties Limited
9 Clipper Place
Ljp Nz Limited
14a Clipper Place
Excellent System Developments Limited
13 Cyclades Place
Happygo Trading Limited
67 Robbies Road
Pc Pal Limited
5 Redcoat Place
Tekzone Limited
136 Sandspit Road
Visionary Solutions Limited
18 Pounamu Place
Xfrdata Limited
71 Advene Road