K2 2009 Limited, a registered company, was incorporated on 11 Mar 2009. 9429032377460 is the NZ business identifier it was issued. The company has been managed by 7 directors: Bert Denee - an active director whose contract began on 11 Mar 2009,
Justin Savage - an active director whose contract began on 11 Mar 2009,
Jocelyn Nesbit - an active director whose contract began on 11 Mar 2009,
George Kubicki - an active director whose contract began on 28 Jul 2016,
Rob Cunnington - an active director whose contract began on 28 Jul 2016.
Updated on 18 Aug 2024, BizDb's database contains detailed information about 5 addresses this company uses, namely: Level 1, 60 Highbrook Drive, East Tamaki, Auckland, 2013 (registered address),
Level 1, 60 Highbrook Drive, East Tamaki, Auckland, 2013 (service address),
Level 2, 116 Harris Road, East Tamaki, Auckland, 2140 (registered address),
Level 2, 116 Harris Road, East Tamaki, Auckland, 2140 (physical address) among others.
K2 2009 Limited had been using 470 Parnell Road, Parnell, Auckland as their physical address up to 24 May 2021.
Old names used by this company, as we identified at BizDb, included: from 11 Mar 2009 to 04 Jul 2018 they were called K2 Interiors Limited.
One entity owns all company shares (exactly 900 shares) - Harbour Group Limited - located at 2013, East Tamaki, Auckland.
Other active addresses
Address #4: Level 2, 116 Harris Road, East Tamaki, Auckland, 2140 New Zealand
Registered & physical & service address used from 24 May 2021
Address #5: Level 1, 60 Highbrook Drive, East Tamaki, Auckland, 2013 New Zealand
Registered & service address used from 02 Nov 2023
Principal place of activity
4 Fred Thomas Drive, Takapuna, Auckland, 0622 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: 470 Parnell Road, Parnell, Auckland, 1052 New Zealand
Physical address used from 23 Apr 2013 to 24 May 2021
Address #2: 470 Parnell Road, Parnell, Auckland, 1052 New Zealand
Registered address used from 18 Mar 2013 to 24 May 2021
Address #3: 470 Parnell Road, Parnell, Auckland, 1052 New Zealand
Registered address used from 16 Oct 2012 to 18 Mar 2013
Address #4: 470 Parnell Road, Parnell, Auckland, 1052 New Zealand
Physical address used from 16 Oct 2012 to 23 Apr 2013
Address #5: C/ Hayes Knight (nz) Limited, 5 William Laurie Place, Albany New Zealand
Registered address used from 11 Mar 2009 to 16 Oct 2012
Address #6: C/ Hayes Knight Limited, 5 William Laurie Place, Albany New Zealand
Physical address used from 11 Mar 2009 to 16 Oct 2012
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 900
Annual return filing month: April
Annual return last filed: 04 Apr 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 900 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Harbour Group Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429032547030 |
East Tamaki Auckland 2013 New Zealand |
11 Mar 2009 - |
Ultimate Holding Company
Bert Denee - Director
Appointment date: 11 Mar 2009
Address: Devonport, Auckland, 0624 New Zealand
Address used since 11 Mar 2009
Justin Savage - Director
Appointment date: 11 Mar 2009
Address: Red Beach, Red Beach, 0932 New Zealand
Address used since 04 Mar 2021
Address: Rd 4, Albany, 0794 New Zealand
Address used since 02 Apr 2012
Jocelyn Nesbit - Director
Appointment date: 11 Mar 2009
Address: Riverhead, Riverhead, 0820 New Zealand
Address used since 02 Oct 2017
Address: Te Atatu South, Auckland, 0610 New Zealand
Address used since 11 Mar 2009
George Kubicki - Director
Appointment date: 28 Jul 2016
Address: West Harbour, Auckland, 0618 New Zealand
Address used since 28 Jul 2016
Rob Cunnington - Director
Appointment date: 28 Jul 2016
Address: Mount Eden, Auckland, 1024 New Zealand
Address used since 28 Jul 2016
Paul Dreyer - Director
Appointment date: 28 Jul 2016
Address: Rothesay Bay, Auckland, 0630 New Zealand
Address used since 28 Jul 2016
Peter Kay - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 11 Mar 2009
Termination date: 11 Dec 2022
Address: Rothesay Bay, Auckland, 0630 New Zealand
Address used since 11 Mar 2009
Farrah Breads Limited
470 Parnell Road
Weston Mcdonald Trustee Limited
470 Parnell Road
The House Company Limited
470 Parnell Road
Takutai Trustee Limited
470 Parnell Road
Hicks Family Trustees Limited
470 Parnell Road
Leo Peng Trustee Limited
470 Parnell Road