Gavus Limited was registered on 19 Feb 2009 and issued a business number of 9429032383768. The registered LTD company has been run by 2 directors: Phylis Evelyn Smith - an active director whose contract began on 19 Feb 2009,
Gavin Rodger Smith - an inactive director whose contract began on 19 Feb 2009 and was terminated on 24 Sep 2019.
According to BizDb's information (last updated on 22 Jul 2024), the company filed 1 address: 8 Park Street, Ashburton, 7700 (type: registered, physical).
Until 30 May 2017, Gavus Limited had been using Level 1, 161 Burnett Street, Ashburton as their physical address.
A total of 100 shares are issued to 2 groups (2 shareholders in total). In the first group, 50 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Smith, Gavin Rodger (an individual) located at Hampstead, Ashburton postcode 7700.
The 2nd group consists of 1 shareholder, holds 50 per cent shares (exactly 50 shares) and includes
Smith, Phylis Evelyn - located at Hampstead, Ashburton.
Previous addresses
Address: Level 1, 161 Burnett Street, Ashburton, 7700 New Zealand
Physical address used from 05 Jul 2011 to 30 May 2017
Address: Level 1, 161 Burnett Street, Ashburton, 7700 New Zealand
Registered address used from 08 Jun 2011 to 30 May 2017
Address: 248 East Street, Ashburton, 7700 New Zealand
Registered address used from 23 Mar 2011 to 08 Jun 2011
Address: 248 East Street, Ashburton, 7700 New Zealand
Physical address used from 23 Mar 2011 to 05 Jul 2011
Address: 14 The Terrace, Timaru New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 19 Feb 2009 to 23 Mar 2011
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: March
Annual return last filed: 13 Mar 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Individual | Smith, Gavin Rodger |
Hampstead Ashburton 7700 New Zealand |
19 Feb 2009 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Individual | Smith, Phylis Evelyn |
Hampstead Ashburton 7700 New Zealand |
19 Feb 2009 - |
Phylis Evelyn Smith - Director
Appointment date: 19 Feb 2009
Address: Hampstead, Ashburton, 7700 New Zealand
Address used since 04 Apr 2024
Address: Rd 8, Ashburton, 7778 New Zealand
Address used since 08 Apr 2010
Gavin Rodger Smith - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 19 Feb 2009
Termination date: 24 Sep 2019
Address: Rd 8, Ashburton, 7778 New Zealand
Address used since 08 Apr 2010
Swum Nominees Limited
8 Park Street
The Decorative Finish Limited
8 Park Street
Twenty Four Catering Limited
8 Park Street
Reflections (2015) Limited
8 Park Street
J. & T. Sheppard Limited
Ashburton New World
Lynda Stevenson Chartered Accountants Limited
8 Park Street