Chatwin Legal Limited, a registered company, was started on 18 Feb 2009. 9429032383973 is the NZ business number it was issued. "Legal service" (ANZSIC M693130) is how the company has been categorised. The company has been managed by 2 directors: Stephen John Chatwin - an active director whose contract began on 18 Feb 2009,
Louise Clare Meredith - an inactive director whose contract began on 10 Jun 2009 and was terminated on 09 Jun 2010.
Updated on 05 Aug 2024, the BizDb database contains detailed information about 1 address: Level 10, 48 Ward Street, Hamilton, 3204 (type: postal, office).
Chatwin Legal Limited had been using Level 4, 11 Garden Place, Hamilton as their registered address up until 03 Mar 2016.
Previous names for this company, as we identified at BizDb, included: from 20 Feb 2009 to 23 Feb 2009 they were called Chatwin Litigation Limited, from 18 Feb 2009 to 20 Feb 2009 they were called Sj Chatwin Limited.
One entity controls all company shares (exactly 100 shares) - Chatwin, Stephen John - located at 3204, Claudelands, Hamilton.
Previous addresses
Address #1: Level 4, 11 Garden Place, Hamilton, 3204 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 13 Feb 2012 to 03 Mar 2016
Address #2: Level 4, Nzi Building, Garden Place, Hamilton New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 18 Feb 2009 to 13 Feb 2012
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: February
Annual return last filed: 09 Feb 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 100 | |||
Individual | Chatwin, Stephen John |
Claudelands Hamilton 3214 New Zealand |
18 Feb 2009 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Meredith, Louise Clare |
Claudelands Hamilton |
10 Jun 2009 - 10 Jun 2009 |
Stephen John Chatwin - Director
Appointment date: 18 Feb 2009
Address: Claudelands, Hamilton, 3214 New Zealand
Address used since 05 Feb 2018
Address: Rd 2, Hamilton, 3282 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Feb 2017
Louise Clare Meredith - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 10 Jun 2009
Termination date: 09 Jun 2010
Address: Tauranga, 3110 New Zealand
Address used since 09 Feb 2010
Mcquarrie Developments Limited
Level 10, Tower Building
Mcquarrie Qt Limited
Level 10
Mcquarrie Group Limited
Level 10
Karmon Limited
Level 10
Chatwin (george) Trustees Limited
Level 10, Tower Building
Rave Build Management Limited
Level 11
Beattie Rickman Legal Limited
544 Victoria Street
Beattie Rickman Legal Services Limited
554 Victoria Street
Br Legal Trustee Company Limited
Beattie Rickman Legal, Level 2
Dti Lawyers Limited
Level 6, 127 Alexandra Street
Dti Trustees Limited
Level 1, 127 Alexandra Street
Gilchrist Burns Trustees Limited
Level 2, Pricewaterhousecoopers Centre