Whk Trustees (Wellington) 2009 Limited, a registered company, was started on 18 Feb 2009. 9429032414752 is the NZ business identifier it was issued. This company has been run by 15 directors: Leslie Allen Foy - an active director whose contract started on 18 Feb 2009,
Russell Holmes - an active director whose contract started on 01 Jul 2010,
Michael Johann Brunner - an active director whose contract started on 01 Aug 2016,
Rochelle Roddick - an active director whose contract started on 11 Sep 2019,
Helen Malanchak - an inactive director whose contract started on 11 Sep 2019 and was terminated on 14 Dec 2022.
Last updated on 25 Aug 2024, BizDb's data contains detailed information about 1 address: Level 1, Findex House, 57 Willis Street, Wellington, 6011 (category: physical, registered).
Whk Trustees (Wellington) 2009 Limited had been using Level 1, Findex House, 57 Willis Street, Wellington as their registered address up to 14 Feb 2020.
A single entity owns all company shares (exactly 200 shares) - Whk Services (Wellington) Limited - located at 6011, 57 Willis Street, Wellington.
Previous addresses
Address: Level 1, Findex House, 57 Willis Street, Wellington, 6011 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 24 May 2019 to 14 Feb 2020
Address: Level 1, Crowe Horwath House, 57 Willis Street, Wellington, 6011 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 01 Mar 2016 to 24 May 2019
Address: Level 6. Westfield Tower, 45 Knights Road, Lower Hutt New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 18 Feb 2009 to 01 Mar 2016
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 200
Annual return filing month: February
Annual return last filed: 07 Feb 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 200 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Whk Services (wellington) Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429033853475 |
57 Willis Street Wellington 6011 New Zealand |
04 Feb 2015 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Burge, Richard Brian |
Whitby Porirua |
18 Feb 2009 - 04 Feb 2015 |
Individual | Walshe, Brian Joseph |
Eastbourne Lower Hutt |
18 Feb 2009 - 12 Jul 2013 |
Individual | Chan, Michael |
Khandallah Wellington |
18 Feb 2009 - 12 Jul 2013 |
Individual | Foy, Leslie Allen |
Khandallah Wellington |
18 Feb 2009 - 04 Feb 2015 |
Ultimate Holding Company
Leslie Allen Foy - Director
Appointment date: 18 Feb 2009
Address: Khandallah, Wellington, 6035 New Zealand
Address used since 18 Feb 2009
Russell Holmes - Director
Appointment date: 01 Jul 2010
Address: Silverstream, Upper Hutt, 5019 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Jul 2010
Michael Johann Brunner - Director
Appointment date: 01 Aug 2016
Address: Papakowhai, Porirua, 5024 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Aug 2016
Rochelle Roddick - Director
Appointment date: 11 Sep 2019
Address: Camborne, Porirua, 5026 New Zealand
Address used since 11 Sep 2019
Helen Malanchak - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 11 Sep 2019
Termination date: 14 Dec 2022
Address: Leamington, Cambridge, 3432 New Zealand
Address used since 27 May 2022
Address: Hutt Central, Lower Hutt, 5010 New Zealand
Address used since 11 Sep 2019
David John Shadwell - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 20 Oct 2016
Termination date: 20 Dec 2019
Address: Whitby, Porirua, 5024 New Zealand
Address used since 20 Oct 2016
Paolo Caccioppoli - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 13 Jun 2016
Termination date: 01 Feb 2019
Address: Maymorn, Upper Hutt, 5018 New Zealand
Address used since 13 Jun 2016
Haydn Keith Hughes - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 13 Jun 2016
Termination date: 02 Feb 2018
Address: Khandallah, Wellington, 6035 New Zealand
Address used since 13 Jun 2016
Todrick Simon A'court Taylor - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 01 Dec 2015
Termination date: 28 Jun 2016
Address: Seatoun, Wellington, 6022 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Dec 2015
Michelle Dykes - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 01 Jul 2010
Termination date: 19 Mar 2016
Address: Whitby, Porirua, 5024 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Jul 2010
Richard Brian Burge - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 18 Feb 2009
Termination date: 27 Feb 2016
Address: Whitby, Porirua, 5024 New Zealand
Address used since 18 Feb 2009
Ben Blackler - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 01 Jul 2010
Termination date: 19 Dec 2013
Address: Maungaraki, Lower Hutt, 5010 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Jul 2010
Brian Joseph Walshe - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 18 Feb 2009
Termination date: 01 May 2013
Address: Muritai, Lower Hutt, 5013 New Zealand
Address used since 11 Feb 2010
Michael Chan - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 18 Feb 2009
Termination date: 01 May 2013
Address: Khandallah, Wellington,
Address used since 18 Feb 2009
Haydn Hughes - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 01 Jul 2010
Termination date: 01 Aug 2012
Address: Khandallah, Wellington, 6035 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Jul 2010
Mcauley Finance Limited
Level 4, Willbank House
Beco Builders & Contractors Limited
Level 4, Willbank House
Abby Builders Limited
Level 4, Willbank House
Lausanne Office Services Limited
Level 4, Willbank House
Active Communications Limited
Level 4, Willbank House
Hania Street Limited
Level 4, Willbank House