Kauri House (2008) Limited was registered on 18 Mar 2008 and issued an NZ business number of 9429032863796. The registered LTD company has been run by 4 directors: Catherine Jean Susan Mills - an active director whose contract started on 18 Mar 2008,
Michael William Joseph Mills - an active director whose contract started on 13 Oct 2010,
Gary Roberts Browne - an inactive director whose contract started on 01 May 2008 and was terminated on 13 Oct 2010,
Michael Mills - an inactive director whose contract started on 18 Mar 2008 and was terminated on 01 May 2008.
According to BizDb's database (last updated on 14 Sep 2024), this company registered 1 address: 164 Ti Point Road, Rd 5, Leigh, 0985 (type: registered, physical).
Up to 21 Apr 2017, Kauri House (2008) Limited had been using 150 Ti Point Road, Rd 5, Warkworth as their physical address.
A total of 100 shares are allocated to 1 group (1 sole shareholder). In the first group, 100 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Millsgang Trustee Limited (an entity) located at Rd 5, Leigh postcode 0985.
Previous addresses
Address #1: 150 Ti Point Road, Rd 5, Warkworth, 0985 New Zealand
Physical address used from 21 Oct 2010 to 21 Apr 2017
Address #2: 150 Ti Point Road, Rd 5, Warkworth, 0985 New Zealand
Registered address used from 21 Oct 2010 to 15 Oct 2021
Address #3: 7a Kowhai Rd, Mairangi Bay New Zealand
Physical address used from 07 Apr 2009 to 21 Oct 2010
Address #4: 7a Kowhai Rd, Mairangi Bay New Zealand
Registered address used from 24 Jun 2008 to 21 Oct 2010
Address #5: Darren Knight & Associates Tld, 17 Neville Street, Warkworth
Registered address used from 18 Mar 2008 to 24 Jun 2008
Address #6: Darren Knight & Associates Tld, 17 Neville Street, Warkworth
Physical address used from 18 Mar 2008 to 07 Apr 2009
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: September
Annual return last filed: 11 Sep 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 100 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Millsgang Trustee Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429049147315 |
Rd 5 Leigh 0985 New Zealand |
26 Mar 2021 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Mills, Michael William Joseph |
Rd 5 Warkworth 0985 New Zealand |
21 May 2008 - 26 Mar 2021 |
Individual | Mills, Catherine Jean Susan |
Rd 5 Warkworth 0985 New Zealand |
18 Mar 2008 - 26 Mar 2021 |
Individual | Mills, Michael |
Rd 5 Warkworth |
18 Mar 2008 - 27 Jun 2010 |
Entity | Browne Family Investments Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429032844283 Company Number: 2109590 |
02 May 2008 - 13 Oct 2010 | |
Entity | Browne Family Investments Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429032844283 Company Number: 2109590 |
02 May 2008 - 13 Oct 2010 |
Catherine Jean Susan Mills - Director
Appointment date: 18 Mar 2008
Address: Rd 5, Leigh, 0985 New Zealand
Address used since 08 Jul 2020
Address: Rd 5, Warkworth, 0985 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Jun 2016
Michael William Joseph Mills - Director
Appointment date: 13 Oct 2010
Address: Ti Point, Warkworth, 0985 New Zealand
Address used since 08 Jul 2015
Gary Roberts Browne - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 01 May 2008
Termination date: 13 Oct 2010
Address: Rd 5, Warkworth, 0985 New Zealand
Address used since 25 Apr 2010
Michael Mills - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 18 Mar 2008
Termination date: 01 May 2008
Address: Rd 5, Warkworth, New Zealand
Address used since 18 Mar 2008
A & J Lethbridge Painting And Decorating Limited
148 Ti Point Road
Matakana Mobile Valet Limited
160 Ti Point Road
Aley Trustee Limited
170 Ti Point Road
Ayurveda Life Limited
118 Ti Point Road
Lenox Avenue Limited
25 Ti Point Road
Ti Point Reptile Park Limited
27 Ti Point Road Rd