Penpar Building Limited was launched on 04 Dec 2007 and issued an NZ business identifier of 9429033004006. This registered LTD company has been run by 2 directors: Peter Lyndon Penniall - an active director whose contract started on 04 Dec 2007,
Yvonne Jean Penniall - an inactive director whose contract started on 04 Dec 2007 and was terminated on 11 Jun 2019.
As stated in our data (updated on 08 Sep 2024), the company registered 5 addresess: 5B Mules Street, Stoke, Nelson, 7011 (physical address),
5B Mules Street, Stoke, Nelson, 7011 (service address),
5B Mules Street, Stoke, Nelson, 7011 (other address),
5B Mules Street, Stoke, Nelson, 7011 (records address) among others.
Until 21 Jun 2018, Penpar Building Limited had been using 6 Norwich Street, Stoke, Nelson as their physical address.
A total of 300 shares are allocated to 1 group (1 sole shareholder). In the first group, 300 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Penniall, Peter Lyndon (an individual) located at Stoke, Nelson postcode 7011.
Other active addresses
Address #4: 5b Mules Street, Stoke, Nelson, 7011 New Zealand
Other (Address for Records) & records address (Address for Records) used from 13 Jun 2018
Address #5: 5b Mules Street, Stoke, Nelson, 7011 New Zealand
Physical & service address used from 21 Jun 2018
Previous addresses
Address #1: 6 Norwich Street, Stoke, Nelson, 7011 New Zealand
Physical address used from 16 Jun 2014 to 21 Jun 2018
Address #2: 6 Norwich Street, Stoke, Nelson, 7011 New Zealand
Registered address used from 16 Jun 2014 to 15 Jul 2015
Address #3: 231 Annesbrook Drive, Wakatu, Nelson, 7011 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 29 Jun 2011 to 16 Jun 2014
Address #4: 231 Annesbrook Drive, Nelson New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 26 Jun 2008 to 29 Jun 2011
Address #5: C/-gary Breakspeare, 94 Aranui Road, Mapua, Nelson
Physical & registered address used from 04 Dec 2007 to 26 Jun 2008
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 300
Annual return filing month: June
Annual return last filed: 02 Jul 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 300 | |||
Individual | Penniall, Peter Lyndon |
Stoke Nelson 7011 New Zealand |
04 Dec 2007 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Penniall, Yvonne Jean |
Stoke Nelson 7011 New Zealand |
04 Dec 2007 - 11 Jun 2019 |
Entity | C & F Trustees 33288 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429033004266 Company Number: 2065939 |
211 Bridge Street Nelson 7010 New Zealand |
04 Dec 2007 - 11 Jun 2019 |
Entity | C & F Trustees 33288 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429033004266 Company Number: 2065939 |
211 Bridge Street Nelson 7010 New Zealand |
04 Dec 2007 - 11 Jun 2019 |
Peter Lyndon Penniall - Director
Appointment date: 04 Dec 2007
Address: Stoke, Nelson, 7011 New Zealand
Address used since 07 Jul 2015
Yvonne Jean Penniall - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 04 Dec 2007
Termination date: 11 Jun 2019
Address: Stoke, Nelson, 7011 New Zealand
Address used since 13 Jun 2018
Address: Stoke, Nelson, 7011 New Zealand
Address used since 07 Jul 2015
Rover Car Club Nelson Incorporated
13 Leicester Street
Classic Motoring Awards Week Trust
95 Quarantine Road
The Knights Of The Southern Cross Of New Zealand Incorporated
226 Nayland Road
Something Super Limited
4 Honey-tye Way
Nurture@home Limited
38 Devon Street
The Nelson Malborough Loop Trust Board
C/o Nayland College