Nzfil Placements Limited, a registered company, was started on 14 Nov 2007. 9429033031996 is the business number it was issued. This company has been managed by 2 directors: Bruce Porteous - an active director whose contract began on 14 Nov 2007,
Phillip Basil Stent Porteous - an active director whose contract began on 21 Aug 2015.
Updated on 08 Aug 2024, our database contains detailed information about 2 addresses the company registered, namely: 1A Pedlar Street, Mangakakahi, Rotorua, 3015 (registered address),
1A Pedlar Street, Mangakakahi, Rotorua, 3015 (service address),
1177 Goodwood Road, Palmerston, Palmerston, 9430 (physical address).
Nzfil Placements Limited had been using 1177 Goodwood Road, Palmerston, Palmerston as their registered address up until 18 Apr 2023.
A single entity owns all company shares (exactly 1000 shares) - Porteous, Bruce - located at 3015, Vito Cruz, Manila.
Previous addresses
Address #1: 1177 Goodwood Road, Palmerston, Palmerston, 9430 New Zealand
Registered & service address used from 09 Sep 2020 to 18 Apr 2023
Address #2: 9 Mcbride Street, Frankton, Queenstown, 9300 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 30 Apr 2018 to 09 Sep 2020
Address #3: 91 Carroll Street, Dunedin Central, Dunedin, 9016 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 31 Aug 2015 to 30 Apr 2018
Address #4: 478 Wyllye Road, Rd1,, Warkworth New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 14 Nov 2007 to 31 Aug 2015
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 1000
Annual return filing month: March
Annual return last filed: 10 Nov 2022
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 1000 | |||
Individual | Porteous, Bruce |
Vito Cruz Manila 1004 Philippines |
14 Nov 2007 - |
Bruce Porteous - Director
Appointment date: 14 Nov 2007
Address: Mangakakahi, Rotorua, 3015 New Zealand
Address used since 28 Jun 2021
Address: Malate, Manila, 1004 Philippines
Address used since 21 Aug 2015
Phillip Basil Stent Porteous - Director
Appointment date: 21 Aug 2015
Address: Dunedin Central, Dunedin, 9016 New Zealand
Address used since 21 Aug 2015
Nz Holiday Houses Limited
73 Carroll Street
Gc Auto Limited
66 Carroll Street
W&j Group Limited
22 Manor Place
Inner Court Trust
Aspire Training
Te Hou Ora Otepoti Incorporated
78 Carroll Street
James Wren & Co. Limited
50 Carroll Street