Orthovision Howick Limited was started on 18 Oct 2007 and issued a New Zealand Business Number of 9429033078939. The registered LTD company has been managed by 2 directors: Promila Pal - an active director whose contract started on 18 Oct 2007,
Jitendra Pal - an active director whose contract started on 21 Nov 2010.
As stated in our data (last updated on 24 Aug 2024), this company filed 1 address: Selwyn House Medical Centre, 1/46 Wellington Street, Howick, Auckland, 2014 (types include: registered, physical).
Up to 12 Nov 2018, Orthovision Howick Limited had been using Selwyn House Medical Centre, 46 Wellington Street, Howick, Auckland as their registered address.
A total of 100 shares are issued to 2 groups (2 shareholders in total). When considering the first group, 50 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Pal, Promila (an individual) located at Howick, Auckland postcode 2014.
The second group consists of 1 shareholder, holds 50% shares (exactly 50 shares) and includes
Pal, Jitendra - located at Howick, Auckland. Orthovision Howick Limited was categorised as "Clinic - medical - general practice" (business classification Q851110).
Principal place of activity
46 Wellington Street, Howick, Auckland, 2014 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address: Selwyn House Medical Centre, 46 Wellington Street, Howick, Auckland, 2014 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 17 Nov 2011 to 12 Nov 2018
Address: Selwyn House Medical Centre, 16 Selwyn Road, Howick, Auckland New Zealand
Registered address used from 18 Oct 2007 to 17 Nov 2011
Address: 16 Selwyn Road, Howick, Auckland New Zealand
Physical address used from 18 Oct 2007 to 17 Nov 2011
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: October
Annual return last filed: 02 Oct 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Individual | Pal, Promila |
Howick Auckland 2014 New Zealand |
18 Oct 2007 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Individual | Pal, Jitendra |
Howick Auckland 2014 New Zealand |
22 Nov 2010 - |
Promila Pal - Director
Appointment date: 18 Oct 2007
Address: Howick, Auckland, 2014 New Zealand
Address used since 09 Nov 2011
Jitendra Pal - Director
Appointment date: 21 Nov 2010
Address: Howick, Auckland, 2014 New Zealand
Address used since 09 Nov 2011
Ovi Limited
Unit 1, 46 Wellington Street
Galbraiths Trustee Services Limited
Unit 3, 18 Fencible Drive
East Auckland All-power Charitable Trust
18 Fencible Drive
The Howick Returned And Services Association Community Club Incorporated
25 Wellington Street
Sale Street Trust
25 Wellington Street
The Howick R.s.a. Community Trust
25 Wellington Street
Cg Health Limited
4a/10 Wellington Street
Crawford Medical Centre Limited
4 Picton Street
J A And C F Hanne Limited
215 Bleakhouse Road
Jmlt Healthcare Limited
113a Macleans Rd
Marina Medical Limited
14 Island View Terrace
Page Medical Services Limited
C/o 14 Island View Terrace