Treblebene Holdings Limited, a registered company, was incorporated on 03 Sep 2007. 9429033179803 is the New Zealand Business Number it was issued. This company has been run by 2 directors: Linda Suzanne Geary - an active director whose contract began on 03 Sep 2007,
Anna Mary Fitzgibbon - an inactive director whose contract began on 03 Sep 2007 and was terminated on 10 Oct 2012.
Last updated on 04 Aug 2024, the BizDb data contains detailed information about 1 address: Unit 1609, 8 Hereford Street, Freemans Bay, Auckland, 1011 (category: registered, service).
Treblebene Holdings Limited had been using 35B Formby Avenue, Point Chevalier, Auckland as their physical address up to 18 Oct 2017.
A total of 100 shares are issued to 4 shareholders (3 groups). The first group includes 49 shares (49 per cent) held by 2 entities. Moving on the second group consists of 1 shareholder in control of 49 shares (49 per cent). Finally the 3rd share allotment (1 share 1 per cent) made up of 1 entity.
Other active addresses
Address #4: Unit 1609, 8 Hereford Street, Freemans Bay, Auckland, 1011 New Zealand
Registered & service address used from 06 Oct 2023
Principal place of activity
1005/8 Hereford Street, Freemans Bay, Auckland, 1011 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: 35b Formby Avenue, Point Chevalier, Auckland, 1022 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 19 Dec 2016 to 18 Oct 2017
Address #2: 25 Heath Avenue, Northcote, Auckland, 0627 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 18 Oct 2012 to 19 Dec 2016
Address #3: 20 Kingsley Street, Westmere, Auckland, 1022 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 12 Oct 2011 to 18 Oct 2012
Address #4: 20 Kingsley Street, Westmere, Auckland New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 03 Sep 2007 to 12 Oct 2011
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: September
Annual return last filed: 28 Sep 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 49 | |||
Individual | Caulfield, Carol Elizabeth |
Freemans Bay Auckland 1011 New Zealand |
03 Sep 2007 - |
Individual | Geary, Linda Suzanne |
Freemans Bay Auckland 1011 New Zealand |
03 Sep 2007 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 49 | |||
Individual | Geary, Linda Suzanne |
Freemans Bay Auckland 1011 New Zealand |
03 Sep 2007 - |
Shares Allocation #3 Number of Shares: 1 | |||
Individual | Geary, Linda Suzanne |
Freemans Bay Auckland 1011 New Zealand |
03 Sep 2007 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Fitzgibbon, Anna Mary |
Westmere Auckland |
03 Sep 2007 - 10 Oct 2012 |
Individual | Smith, Patricia Burnice |
St Heliers Auckland New Zealand |
03 Sep 2007 - 10 Oct 2012 |
Linda Suzanne Geary - Director
Appointment date: 03 Sep 2007
Address: Freemans Bay, Auckland, 1011 New Zealand
Address used since 08 Sep 2023
Address: Freemans Bay, Auckland, 1011 New Zealand
Address used since 31 May 2017
Address: Point Chevalier, Auckland, 1022 New Zealand
Address used since 09 Dec 2016
Anna Mary Fitzgibbon - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 03 Sep 2007
Termination date: 10 Oct 2012
Address: Westmere, Auckland, 1022 New Zealand
Address used since 03 Sep 2007
Sandell Trustees Limited
Unit 1102, 8 Hereford Street
Treblebene Limited
Unit 1005, 8 Hereford Street
Rarangi Holdings Limited
Unit 1001, 8 Hereford Street
8 Hereford Residence Limited
Apartment 1701, 8 Hereford Street
Gosh Atoo Milk Limited
Apartment 1701
Ventia Nz Limited
Level 6