Wimborne Dairy Farm Limited, a registered company, was registered on 02 Aug 2007. 9429033238722 is the number it was issued. This company has been managed by 4 directors: Kieran Joseph Guiney - an active director whose contract began on 02 Aug 2007,
Leonie Frances Guiney - an active director whose contract began on 02 Aug 2007,
Ronald David Smith - an active director whose contract began on 02 Aug 2007,
Patricia Evelyn Smith - an inactive director whose contract began on 02 Aug 2007 and was terminated on 18 Apr 2009.
Last updated on 07 Aug 2024, BizDb's database contains detailed information about 1 address: 504 Wairakei Road, Burnside, Christchurch, 8053 (type: physical, registered).
Wimborne Dairy Farm Limited had been using Brown Glassford & Co Limited, Level 1, 55 Kilmore Street, Christchurch as their physical address up until 06 Nov 2012.
A total of 10000 shares are allocated to 5 shareholders (2 groups). The first group consists of 5000 shares (50 per cent) held by 3 entities. Next there is the second group which includes 2 shareholders in control of 5000 shares (50 per cent).
Previous address
Address: Brown Glassford & Co Limited, Level 1, 55 Kilmore Street, Christchurch New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 02 Aug 2007 to 06 Nov 2012
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 10000
Annual return filing month: October
Annual return last filed: 18 Oct 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 5000 | |||
Individual | Guiney, Leonie Frances |
R D 17 Fairlie |
02 Aug 2007 - |
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Guiney Bg Trustee Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429048491051 |
Burnside Christchurch 8053 New Zealand |
04 Feb 2021 - |
Individual | Guiney, Kieran Joseph |
R D 17 Fairlie |
02 Aug 2007 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 5000 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Montreal Trustees 2017 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429045966200 |
Christchurch 8011 New Zealand |
01 Aug 2017 - |
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Cascade Creek Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429035126881 |
Cashmere Christchurch 8022 New Zealand |
21 Feb 2008 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Smith, Patricia Evelyn |
18 Whareora Terrace Christchurch |
02 Aug 2007 - 27 Jun 2010 |
Individual | Sissons, Richard John |
29 Ilam Park Place Ilam, Christchurch |
02 Aug 2007 - 27 Jun 2010 |
Individual | Smith, Ronald David |
18 Whareora Place Christchurch |
02 Aug 2007 - 27 Jun 2010 |
Kieran Joseph Guiney - Director
Appointment date: 02 Aug 2007
Address: Rd 17, Fairlie, 7987 New Zealand
Address used since 22 Oct 2009
Leonie Frances Guiney - Director
Appointment date: 02 Aug 2007
Address: Rd 17, Fairlie, 7987 New Zealand
Address used since 22 Oct 2009
Ronald David Smith - Director
Appointment date: 02 Aug 2007
Address: Cashmere, Christchurch, 8022 New Zealand
Address used since 29 Oct 2015
Patricia Evelyn Smith - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 02 Aug 2007
Termination date: 18 Apr 2009
Address: Christchurch,
Address used since 02 Aug 2007
Peter Murphy Painters 2013 Limited
504 Wairakei Road
Haldon Downs Limited
504 Wairakei Road
Blair Farming Company Limited
504 Wairakei Road
Peter Ronald Murphy Investments Limited
504 Wairakei Road
Northington Agricapital Limited
504 Wairakei Road
Scott Evans Sharemilking Limited
504 Wairakei Road