Sunset Cycle Limited, a registered company, was started on 14 May 2007. 9429033419930 is the NZ business identifier it was issued. "Rental of residential property" (business classification L671160) is how the company is categorised. The company has been managed by 3 directors: Oona Smith - an active director whose contract began on 14 May 2007,
Oona Busby - an active director whose contract began on 14 May 2007,
Leigh Francis Smith - an active director whose contract began on 14 May 2007.
Last updated on 14 Sep 2024, our database contains detailed information about 1 address: 55 Coronation Road, Morrinsville, Morrinsville, 3300 (category: registered, physical).
Sunset Cycle Limited had been using 30 Duke Street, Cambridge as their registered address up until 04 Feb 2022.
A total of 1000 shares are issued to 2 shareholders (2 groups). The first group includes 999 shares (99.9%) held by 1 entity. Next there is the second group which includes 1 shareholder in control of 1 share (0.1%).
Previous addresses
Address: 30 Duke Street, Cambridge, 3434 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 26 Jun 2015 to 04 Feb 2022
Address: 12 Garfield Street, Gordonton, Waikato, RD1 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 16 Jul 2013 to 26 Jun 2015
Address: 432 Scotsman Valley Road, Morrinsville Rd1, Waikato, 3371 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 10 May 2012 to 16 Jul 2013
Address: 48 Pond Road, Raglan, 3295 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 15 Mar 2011 to 10 May 2012
Address: 3/68 Monteith Crescent, Meadowbank, Auckland New Zealand
Registered address used from 31 Oct 2007 to 15 Mar 2011
Address: 10/22 Cleveland Road, Parnell, Auckland
Registered address used from 21 Aug 2007 to 31 Oct 2007
Address: L1, 61-63 St Lukes Road, (anz Bank Building), St Lukes, Auckland
Registered address used from 14 May 2007 to 21 Aug 2007
Address: L1, 61-63 St Lukes Road, (anz Bank Building), St Lukes, Auckland New Zealand
Physical address used from 14 May 2007 to 15 Mar 2011
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 1000
Annual return filing month: June
Annual return last filed: 10 Jun 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 999 | |||
Director | Smith, Oona |
Rd 2 Waihi 3682 New Zealand |
12 Mar 2021 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 1 | |||
Individual | Smith, Leigh Francis |
Rd 2 Waihi 3682 New Zealand |
14 May 2007 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Busby, Oona |
Gordonton Waikato RD1 New Zealand |
14 May 2007 - 12 Mar 2021 |
Oona Smith - Director
Appointment date: 14 May 2007
Address: Rd 2, Waihi, 3682 New Zealand
Address used since 12 Mar 2021
Oona Busby - Director
Appointment date: 14 May 2007
Address: Gordonton, Waikato, RD1 New Zealand
Address used since 08 Jul 2013
Leigh Francis Smith - Director
Appointment date: 14 May 2007
Address: Rd 2, Waihi, 3682 New Zealand
Address used since 29 Sep 2023
Address: Waihi, 3682 New Zealand
Address used since 12 Mar 2021
Address: Gordonton, Waikato, RD1 New Zealand
Address used since 08 Jul 2013
Reeves Farms Limited
30 Duke Street
Kathie Hill Hr Limited
30 Duke Street
Smart Shop Limited
30 Duke Street
Maggma Group Limited
30 Duke Street
Zulu Maintenance Limited
30 Duke Street
Jla Farms Limited
30 Duke Street
Block Rd 4 Limited
Chartered Accountants
Hence Investments Limited
Chartered Accountants
Maple Leaf Investments Limited
30 Duke Street
Pmp Investments Limited
Chartered Accountants
Stingray Rentals Limited
30 Duke Street
Syme Pacific Limited
30 Duke Street