Spitfire Creative Communications Limited was started on 01 Feb 2007 and issued a New Zealand Business Number of 9429033635163. This registered LTD company has been run by 2 directors: Antony Robert Richards - an active director whose contract started on 01 Feb 2007,
Helma Wilhelmina Martha Mitchell - an inactive director whose contract started on 01 Feb 2007 and was terminated on 01 May 2019.
According to our data (updated on 06 Sep 2024), this company filed 1 address: 253 Queen Street, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 (category: shareregister, registered).
Up to 23 Aug 2022, Spitfire Creative Communications Limited had been using Level 1, 34 Sale Street, Auckland as their registered address.
BizDb identified old names for this company: from 15 Feb 2007 to 05 Oct 2018 they were called Hat 2007 Limited, from 01 Feb 2007 to 15 Feb 2007 they were called Btw Hat 2007 Limited.
A total of 100 shares are issued to 1 group (1 sole shareholder). As far as the first group is concerned, 100 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Richards, Antony Robert (an individual) located at Rd 1, Papakura postcode 2580.
Previous addresses
Address #1: Level 1, 34 Sale Street, Auckland, 1010 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 11 Dec 2020 to 23 Aug 2022
Address #2: Level 4, Smith & Caughey Building, 253 Queen Street, Auckland, 1010 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 01 Feb 2007 to 11 Dec 2020
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: August
Annual return last filed: 01 Aug 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 100 | |||
Individual | Richards, Antony Robert |
Rd 1 Papakura 2580 New Zealand |
12 Mar 2007 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Mitchell, Helma Wilhelmina Martha |
R D 3 Kaukapakapa, Auckland |
01 Feb 2007 - 08 Feb 2007 |
Entity | Mediar Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429036001125 Company Number: 1299107 |
29 Apr 2019 - 15 Aug 2022 | |
Entity | Mediar Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429036001125 Company Number: 1299107 |
Rd3 Makarau Auckland 0873 New Zealand |
29 Apr 2019 - 15 Aug 2022 |
Individual | Matson, Anthony |
Birkenhead Auckland 0626 New Zealand |
03 Feb 2019 - 15 Aug 2022 |
Individual | Mitchell, Campbell John |
R D 3 Kaukapakapa New Zealand |
24 Sep 2009 - 29 Apr 2019 |
Individual | Mitchell, Helma Wilhelmina Martha |
R D 3 Kaukapakapa, Auckland |
12 Mar 2007 - 29 Apr 2019 |
Individual | Mitchell, Campbell John |
R D 3 Kaukapakapa, Auckland |
01 Feb 2007 - 08 Feb 2007 |
Individual | Mitchell, Helma Wilhelmina Martha |
R D 3 Kaukapakapa, Auckland |
12 Mar 2007 - 29 Apr 2019 |
Individual | Richards, Antony Robert |
Remuera Auckland |
01 Feb 2007 - 08 Feb 2007 |
Individual | Sheppard, Bruce Raymond |
Bucklands Beach Auckland |
01 Feb 2007 - 08 Feb 2007 |
Individual | Mitchell, Campbell John |
R D 3 Kaukapakapa New Zealand |
24 Sep 2009 - 29 Apr 2019 |
Antony Robert Richards - Director
Appointment date: 01 Feb 2007
Address: Karaka, Franklin, Auckland, 2580 New Zealand
Address used since 15 Aug 2022
Address: Remuera, Auckland, 1050 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Feb 2007
Helma Wilhelmina Martha Mitchell - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 01 Feb 2007
Termination date: 01 May 2019
Address: Rd 3, Kaukapakapa, 0873 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Sep 2009
Hibiscus Marine & Storage Limited
4th Floor, 253 Queen Street
Cumuli Limited
Level 4, Smith & Caughey Building
Hahei Limited
253 Queen Street
Le Tong Trustee Limited
Level 4, Smith & Caughey Building
Chang Wei Trustee Limited
Level 4, Smith & Caughey Building
Ezy Trustee Limited
Level 4, Smith & Caughey Building