Wealthcare Private No.1 Limited, a registered company, was launched on 22 Dec 2006. 9429033683942 is the NZBN it was issued. "Investment" (business classification K624040) is how the company was categorised. The company has been run by 2 directors: Susan Jane Stewart - an active director whose contract started on 22 Dec 2006,
Hamish Neil Mcphail - an active director whose contract started on 22 Dec 2006.
Last updated on 22 Aug 2024, BizDb's database contains detailed information about 1 address: Level 3, 6 Arawa Street, Grafton, Auckland, 1023 (type: registered, service).
Wealthcare Private No.1 Limited had been using Level 1, 52-54 Grafton Road, Grafton, Auckland as their registered address up to 04 Apr 2011.
A total of 1000 shares are allotted to 10 shareholders (5 groups). The first group consists of 200 shares (20%) held by 2 entities. There is also a second group which includes 2 shareholders in control of 200 shares (20%). Lastly there is the 3rd share allocation (200 shares 20%) made up of 2 entities.
Previous addresses
Address #1: Level 1, 52-54 Grafton Road, Grafton, Auckland New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 11 Jul 2008 to 04 Apr 2011
Address #2: Level 3, 6 Arawa Street, Newmarket, Auckland
Physical & registered address used from 22 Dec 2006 to 11 Jul 2008
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 1000
Annual return filing month: March
Annual return last filed: 27 Mar 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 200 | |||
Individual | Fallow, Neil George |
Hataitai Wellington New Zealand |
11 Mar 2009 - |
Individual | Surridge, Colleen Elizabeth |
Hataitai Wellington New Zealand |
11 Mar 2009 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 200 | |||
Individual | Fancourt, Robin Frances |
New Plymouth New Zealand |
11 Mar 2009 - |
Individual | Fancourt, Michael William |
New Plymouth New Zealand |
11 Mar 2009 - |
Shares Allocation #3 Number of Shares: 200 | |||
Individual | Phillips, Lorraine |
Whitby Porirua New Zealand |
11 Mar 2009 - |
Individual | Stone, Katherine Dana |
Whitby Porirua New Zealand |
11 Mar 2009 - |
Shares Allocation #4 Number of Shares: 200 | |||
Individual | Reid, James Stewart |
Lower Hutt New Zealand |
11 Mar 2009 - |
Individual | Reid, Christine Phyllis Vivien |
Lower Hutt New Zealand |
11 Mar 2009 - |
Shares Allocation #5 Number of Shares: 200 | |||
Individual | Lee, Karen Jacqueline |
149 Parnell Road Auckland New Zealand |
11 Mar 2009 - |
Individual | Law, Stephen Ken |
149 Parnell Road Auckland New Zealand |
11 Mar 2009 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Mcphail, Hamish Neil |
Parnell Auckland |
22 Dec 2006 - 27 Jun 2010 |
Susan Jane Stewart - Director
Appointment date: 22 Dec 2006
Address: Remuera, Auckland, 1050 New Zealand
Address used since 23 Mar 2016
Hamish Neil Mcphail - Director
Appointment date: 22 Dec 2006
Address: Parnell, Auckland, 1052 New Zealand
Address used since 23 Mar 2016
A Brown Trustee Limited
Level 2
Nickalvia Corporate Trustee Limited
Level 2
Jurijapa Limited
Suite 2, 3 Arawa Street
Farnley Trustee Limited
Level 2
Jimmy Buffit Boat Brokers Limited
2 Level Street
Abc Investments Limited
Unit Q, 6 Carlton Gore Road
City Apartment Rentals Limited
Apartment 1 L
M No 1 Limited
6-8 Edward Wayte Place,
Remson Investments Nz Limited
Level 5, 3 Ferncroft Street
Rtb Limited
Level 5 Elders House
Wealthcare Private No.4 Limited
Level 2