484 George St Management Limited, a registered company, was registered on 04 Sep 2006. 9429033893983 is the NZ business identifier it was issued. The company has been run by 2 directors: Stephen Ross Brent - an active director whose contract started on 04 Sep 2006,
Richard James O'meara - an active director whose contract started on 12 Jul 2021.
Last updated on 26 Aug 2024, our data contains detailed information about 1 address: The Mountaineer Building, Level 3, 32 Rees Street, Queenstown, 9300 (types include: registered, physical).
484 George St Management Limited had been using The Mountaineer Building, Level 3, 32 Rees Street, Queenstown as their registered address up to 12 Aug 2019.
Previous aliases for the company, as we found at BizDb, included: from 08 Sep 2014 to 12 Jul 2021 they were named Brent Trustees Limited, from 04 Sep 2006 to 08 Sep 2014 they were named Ra Trustee Holdings Limited.
A total of 100 shares are allotted to 2 shareholders (2 groups). The first group is comprised of 50 shares (50%) held by 1 entity. Next we have the second group which consists of 1 shareholder in control of 50 shares (50%).
Previous addresses
Address: The Mountaineer Building, Level 3, 32 Rees Street, Queenstown, 9300 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 01 Sep 2015 to 12 Aug 2019
Address: C/- Cavell Leitch, Level 2, 32 Rees Street, Queenstown, 9300 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 28 Aug 2013 to 01 Sep 2015
Address: C/- Anderson Lloyd, Level 2, 13 Camp Street, Queenstown, 9300 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 20 Aug 2010 to 28 Aug 2013
Address: C/-brent Law, Level 1, 24 Camp Street, Queenstown 9348 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 03 Mar 2008 to 20 Aug 2010
Address: C/-stephen Brent Solicitor, Level 2, 36 Shotover Street, Queenstown
Registered & physical address used from 04 Sep 2006 to 03 Mar 2008
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: August
Annual return last filed: 01 Aug 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Individual | O'meara, Richard James |
Lake Hayes Queenstown 9304 New Zealand |
12 Jul 2021 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Individual | Brent, Stephen Ross |
Lower Shotover Queenstown 9304 New Zealand |
04 Sep 2006 - |
Stephen Ross Brent - Director
Appointment date: 04 Sep 2006
Address: Lower Shotover, Queenstown, 9304 New Zealand
Address used since 04 Aug 2017
Address: R D 1, Queenstown, 9371 New Zealand
Address used since 24 Aug 2015
Richard James O'meara - Director
Appointment date: 12 Jul 2021
Address: Lake Hayes, Queenstown, 9304 New Zealand
Address used since 15 Dec 2022
Address: Lake Hayes, Queenstown, 9304 New Zealand
Address used since 12 Jul 2021
Warner Nz Investments Lp
Cavell Leitch
Good Group Limited
Level 3 Mountaineer Building
Resort Property Trust Limited
32 Rees St
Blackstar Properties Limited
32 Rees Street
Sfc Properties Limited
Level 3 Mountaineer Building
Goodbars.co.nz Limited
Level 3 Mountaineer Building