Pascha Therapies Limited, a registered company, was started on 14 Jul 2006. 9429034029794 is the NZBN it was issued. The company has been run by 2 directors: Yasmeen Gaylene Marie Clark - an active director whose contract started on 14 Jul 2006,
Jonathan Adrian Carlisle Spark - an active director whose contract started on 14 Jul 2006.
Updated on 21 Aug 2024, our data contains detailed information about 1 address: 3/481 Barrington Street, Addington, Christchurch, 8024 (type: registered, service).
Pascha Therapies Limited had been using 6 Elgin Street, Sydenham, Christchurch as their registered address up to 02 Feb 2021.
Previous names for the company, as we identified at BizDb, included: from 14 Jul 2006 to 17 Feb 2010 they were called Intuitive Therapies Limited.
A total of 100 shares are issued to 2 shareholders (2 groups). The first group consists of 30 shares (30%) held by 1 entity. Next we have the second group which consists of 1 shareholder in control of 70 shares (70%).
Other active addresses
Address #4: 125 Main Road, Rd 1, Governors Bay, 8971 New Zealand
Registered & physical & service address used from 02 Feb 2021
Address #5: Flat 3, 481 Barrington Street, Addington, Christchurch, 8024 New Zealand
Postal & office & delivery address used from 17 Jun 2024
Address #6: 3/481 Barrington Street, Addington, Christchurch, 8024 New Zealand
Registered & service address used from 25 Jun 2024
Principal place of activity
165 Madras Street, Christchurch Central, Christchurch, 8011 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: 6 Elgin Street, Sydenham, Christchurch, 8023 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 13 Jun 2013 to 02 Feb 2021
Address #2: 165 Madras St, Christchurch, 8011 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 01 Apr 2008 to 13 Jun 2013
Address #3: 81 Cashmere Rd, Cashmere, Christchurch
Registered & physical address used from 14 Jul 2006 to 01 Apr 2008
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: June
Annual return last filed: 17 Jun 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 30 | |||
Individual | Clark, Yasmeen Gaylene Marie |
Addington Christchurch 8024 New Zealand |
14 Jul 2006 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 70 | |||
Individual | Spark, Jonathan Adrian Carlisle |
Addington Christchurch 8024 New Zealand |
14 Jul 2006 - |
Yasmeen Gaylene Marie Clark - Director
Appointment date: 14 Jul 2006
Address: Addington, Christchurch, 8024 New Zealand
Address used since 17 Jun 2024
Address: Banks Peninsula, Christchurch, 8971 New Zealand
Address used since 24 Jun 2020
Address: Rd 1, Little River, 7591 New Zealand
Address used since 08 Jun 2012
Jonathan Adrian Carlisle Spark - Director
Appointment date: 14 Jul 2006
Address: Addington, Christchurch, 8024 New Zealand
Address used since 17 Jun 2024
Address: Rd 1, Governors Bay, 8971 New Zealand
Address used since 24 Jun 2020
Address: Rd 1, Little River, 7591 New Zealand
Address used since 08 Jun 2012
5th Street Limited
6 Elgin Street
Coffee Culture Investments Limited
2 Elgin Street
Coffee Partners Limited
2 Elgin Street
Coffee Culture Franchises Limited
2 Elgin Street
Coffee Culture Limited
2 Elgin Street
Coffee Culture Charitable Foundation
2 Elgin Street