Cowling Group Performance Limited, a registered company, was launched on 30 Jun 2006. 9429034035740 is the NZ business number it was issued. The company has been managed by 4 directors: Steven James Cowling - an active director whose contract began on 30 Jun 2006,
Christopher John Cowling - an active director whose contract began on 30 Nov 2010,
Maurice Arthur Cowling - an active director whose contract began on 30 Nov 2010,
Nigel Dean Hollis - an inactive director whose contract began on 30 Jun 2006 and was terminated on 30 Nov 2010.
Last updated on 16 Jul 2024, our data contains detailed information about 1 address: 247 Cameron Road, Tauranga, Tauranga, 3110 (types include: physical, registered).
Cowling Group Performance Limited had been using 51 Arawa Street, Matamata as their physical address up until 20 Feb 2017.
More names for the company, as we established at BizDb, included: from 22 Feb 2007 to 31 May 2019 they were called Tauranga Hiab Transport Limited, from 30 Jun 2006 to 22 Feb 2007 they were called J V Hiabs Limited.
A total of 9000 shares are allotted to 5 shareholders (3 groups). The first group is comprised of 900 shares (10%) held by 2 entities. Moving on the second group consists of 1 shareholder in control of 7200 shares (80%). Lastly we have the next share allocation (900 shares 10%) made up of 2 entities.
Previous address
Address: 51 Arawa Street, Matamata New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 30 Jun 2006 to 20 Feb 2017
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 9000
Annual return filing month: June
Annual return last filed: 14 Jun 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 900 | |||
Director | Cowling, Christopher John |
Pyes Pa Tauranga 3112 New Zealand |
28 Mar 2017 - |
Director | Cowling, Maurice Arthur |
Mount Maunganui 3116 New Zealand |
28 Mar 2017 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 7200 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Cowling Group Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429040145426 |
Greerton Tauranga 3112 New Zealand |
13 Jan 2014 - |
Shares Allocation #3 Number of Shares: 900 | |||
Director | Cowling, Maurice Arthur |
Mount Maunganui 3116 New Zealand |
28 Mar 2017 - |
Director | Cowling, Steven James |
Pyes Pa Tauranga 3112 New Zealand |
28 Mar 2017 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Entity | Noble & Lee Trustees (2006) Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429034354544 Company Number: 1755459 |
30 Jun 2006 - 20 Mar 2014 | |
Entity | Tauranga Itm Building & Fencing Supplies Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429038316968 Company Number: 809267 |
01 Dec 2010 - 13 Jan 2014 | |
Entity | Noble & Lee Trustees (2006) Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429034354544 Company Number: 1755459 |
30 Jun 2006 - 20 Mar 2014 | |
Entity | Sjc Development Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429034370513 Company Number: 1751317 |
30 Jun 2006 - 28 Mar 2017 | |
Individual | Hollis, Nigel Dean |
Welcome Bay Tauranga New Zealand |
30 Jun 2006 - 01 Dec 2010 |
Entity | Sjc Development Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429034370513 Company Number: 1751317 |
30 Jun 2006 - 28 Mar 2017 | |
Entity | Tauranga Itm Building & Fencing Supplies Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429038316968 Company Number: 809267 |
01 Dec 2010 - 13 Jan 2014 |
Ultimate Holding Company
Steven James Cowling - Director
Appointment date: 30 Jun 2006
Address: Pyes Pa, Tauranga, 3112 New Zealand
Address used since 12 Jun 2024
Address: Ohauiti, Tauranga, 3112 New Zealand
Address used since 28 Mar 2017
Christopher John Cowling - Director
Appointment date: 30 Nov 2010
Address: Pyes Pa, Tauranga, 3112 New Zealand
Address used since 12 Jun 2024
Address: Bellevue, Tauranga, 3110 New Zealand
Address used since 28 Mar 2017
Maurice Arthur Cowling - Director
Appointment date: 30 Nov 2010
Address: Mount Maunganui, 3116 New Zealand
Address used since 14 Jul 2015
Nigel Dean Hollis - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 30 Jun 2006
Termination date: 30 Nov 2010
Address: Welcome Bay, Tauranga,
Address used since 26 May 2008
Everlink Limited
247 Cameron Road
Ahipara Investments Limited
247 Cameron Road
Kiwiberry Te Puke Limited
247 Cameron Road
Cac Limited
247 Cameron Road
Lincoln Road Food Warehouse Limited
247 Cameron Road
Cameron Orchards Limited
247 Cameron Road