Gemini Futures Limited, a registered company, was started on 13 Feb 2006. 9429034309803 is the business number it was issued. "Rental of residential property" (business classification L671160) is how the company has been classified. This company has been supervised by 2 directors: Kim April Mashlan - an active director whose contract started on 13 Feb 2006,
Ross Alexander Walker - an inactive director whose contract started on 13 Feb 2006 and was terminated on 10 Aug 2007.
Last updated on 07 Aug 2024, the BizDb data contains detailed information about 1 address: 115 Titiro Place, Onemana, Rd 1 Whangamata, 3691 (category: physical, registered).
Gemini Futures Limited had been using 18 Prinnbank Terrace, Dinsdale, Hamilton as their registered address until 13 Feb 2019.
A single entity owns all company shares (exactly 100 shares) - Mashlan, Kim April - located at 3691, Onemana, Rd 1 Whangamata.
Previous addresses
Address: 18 Prinnbank Terrace, Dinsdale, Hamilton, 3204 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 11 Aug 2016 to 13 Feb 2019
Address: 115 Rewi Street, Te Awamutu, 3800 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 31 Aug 2011 to 11 Aug 2016
Address: 182 Teasdale Street, Te Awamutu, Te Awamutu, 3800 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 15 Feb 2011 to 31 Aug 2011
Address: Gyde Wansbone Accountants, 195 Mahoe Street, Te Awamutu New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 13 Feb 2006 to 15 Feb 2011
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: February
Annual return last filed: 26 Mar 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 100 | |||
Individual | Mashlan, Kim April |
Onemana Rd 1 Whangamata 3691 New Zealand |
13 Feb 2006 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Walker, Ross Alexander |
Hamilton |
13 Feb 2006 - 27 Jun 2010 |
Kim April Mashlan - Director
Appointment date: 13 Feb 2006
Address: Onemana, Rd 1 Whangamata, 3691 New Zealand
Address used since 22 Feb 2020
Address: Hamilton, 3204 New Zealand
Address used since 17 Feb 2016
Ross Alexander Walker - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 13 Feb 2006
Termination date: 10 Aug 2007
Address: Hamilton,
Address used since 13 Feb 2006
Mokau Fabrication Limited
9 Birch Hill Place
Pre-hospital Care Trust
24 Melva Street
Mvr Holdings Limited
163 Whatawhata Road
Abergil Limited
133 Amanda Avenue
Visual Plastics Limited
105 Amanda Avenue
The Hamilton Bird Club Incorporated
21 Glamis Avenue
38radnor Limited
38 Dalton Crescent
Birch View Limited
134 Dinsdale Road
Firewalker Investments Limited
114 Dinsdale Road
Mrg Holdings Limited
44 Wallace Rd
Rbus Limited
133 Amanda Avenue
Shreyank & Krisha Investments Limited
318, Grandview Road