Dhindsa Associates Limited was registered on 16 Jan 2006 and issued a number of 9429034353301. This registered LTD company has been run by 3 directors: Karamjit Singh - an active director whose contract began on 16 Jan 2006,
Karmjit Singh - an active director whose contract began on 16 Jan 2006,
Shavinder Pal Singh - an active director whose contract began on 08 Apr 2010.
As stated in BizDb's database (updated on 06 Sep 2024), the company registered 1 address: 5 Katterns Street, Katikati, 3129 (types include: office, delivery).
Up to 15 Apr 2010, Dhindsa Associates Limited had been using 136 Park Road, Katikati 3063 as their physical address.
A total of 100 shares are allocated to 2 groups (2 shareholders in total). When considering the first group, 50 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Singh, Shavinder Pal (an individual) located at Katikati 3129.
The second group consists of 1 shareholder, holds 50 per cent shares (exactly 50 shares) and includes
Singh, Karmjit - located at Katikati 3129, Katikati.
Previous addresses
Address #1: 136 Park Road, Katikati 3063
Physical & registered address used from 07 Aug 2008 to 15 Apr 2010
Address #2: 169 Tui Road, Papatoetoe, Auckland
Physical & registered address used from 18 Sep 2007 to 07 Aug 2008
Address #3: 136 Park Road, Katikati 3063
Physical & registered address used from 16 Jan 2006 to 18 Sep 2007
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: May
Annual return last filed: 10 May 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Individual | Singh, Shavinder Pal |
Katikati 3129 New Zealand |
08 Apr 2010 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Director | Singh, Karmjit |
Katikati 3129 Katikati 3129 New Zealand |
11 Oct 2019 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Singh, Karamjit |
Katikati 3063 |
16 Jan 2006 - 11 Oct 2019 |
Karamjit Singh - Director
Appointment date: 16 Jan 2006
Address: Katikati 3129, Katikati, 3129 New Zealand
Address used since 25 Aug 2015
Karmjit Singh - Director
Appointment date: 16 Jan 2006
Address: Katikati 3129, Katikati, 3129 New Zealand
Address used since 25 Aug 2015
Shavinder Pal Singh - Director
Appointment date: 08 Apr 2010
Address: Katikati 3129, Katikati, 3129 New Zealand
Address used since 25 Aug 2015
Rocket U Nz Limited
11 Alexander Street
Hzp+co Nz Limited
13 Alexander Street
Katikati Tyre Shop Limited
48 Fairview Road
Sentosa Ventures Limited
17 Blundell Place
Beach Hire Limited
30c Wills Road
Stonelink Management Limited
26 Tui Place