Crenshaw Holdings Limited, a registered company, was registered on 20 Dec 2005. 9429034367698 is the NZ business identifier it was issued. This company has been managed by 2 directors: Keith Douglas Logie - an active director whose contract started on 20 Dec 2005,
Trent Michael Colyer - an inactive director whose contract started on 20 Dec 2005 and was terminated on 21 Dec 2009.
Last updated on 08 Aug 2024, the BizDb data contains detailed information about 1 address: 21 Tania Place, Blockhouse Bay, Auckland, 0600 (category: registered, physical).
Crenshaw Holdings Limited had been using 15 Stirling Street, Remuera, Auckland as their registered address up until 24 Apr 2009.
A total of 100 shares are allocated to 2 shareholders (2 groups). The first group includes 50 shares (50 per cent) held by 1 entity. There is also a second group which consists of 1 shareholder in control of 50 shares (50 per cent).
Previous addresses
Address: 15 Stirling Street, Remuera, Auckland
Registered & physical address used from 23 Aug 2007 to 24 Apr 2009
Address: C/-whk Gosling Chapman, Level 6, Whk, Gosling Chapman Tower, 51-53, Shortland Str, Auckland
Physical & registered address used from 17 Aug 2006 to 23 Aug 2007
Address: C/-chapman Tripp, 23-29 Albert Street, Auckland
Registered & physical address used from 20 Dec 2005 to 17 Aug 2006
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: September
Annual return last filed: 12 Sep 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Individual | Logie, Keith Douglas |
Blockhouse Bay Auckland New Zealand |
20 Dec 2005 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Individual | Colyer, Trent Michael |
Royal Oak Auckland 1023 New Zealand |
20 Dec 2005 - |
Keith Douglas Logie - Director
Appointment date: 20 Dec 2005
Address: Blockhouse Bay, Auckland, 0600 New Zealand
Address used since 17 Apr 2009
Trent Michael Colyer - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 20 Dec 2005
Termination date: 21 Dec 2009
Address: Epsom, Auckland, 1023 New Zealand
Address used since 17 Apr 2009
Childcare Plus Learning Centre Limited
25 Heaphy Street
Keep Growing Tauranga Limited
25 Heaphy Street
Hopper Jones Trustee Limited
491a Blockhouse Bay Road
Hill Top School Trust Board
37 Heaphy Street
Zagazoo Investments Limited
203c Taylor Street
Tubberty Valuations Limited
44b Bolton Street