I & G Brcic Limited, a registered company, was launched on 14 Dec 2005. 9429034386545 is the business number it was issued. "Building, house construction" (ANZSIC E301120) is how the company is classified. This company has been managed by 2 directors: Ivan Brcic - an active director whose contract started on 14 Dec 2005,
Gabrielle Brcic - an active director whose contract started on 14 Dec 2005.
Updated on 10 Sep 2024, our data contains detailed information about 1 address: 867 Whitford-Maraetai Road, Auckland, 2571 (type: physical, registered).
I & G Brcic Limited had been using 33/2 Bishop Dunn Place, Flat Bush, Manukau as their registered address up until 15 Jun 2018.
All shares (1000 shares exactly) are owned by a single group consisting of 2 entities, namely:
Brcic, Ivan (an individual) located at Howick, Auckland postcode 2010,
Brcic, Gabrielle (an individual) located at Howick, Auckland postcode 2010.
Previous addresses
Address: 33/2 Bishop Dunn Place, Flat Bush, Manukau, 2013 New Zealand
Registered address used from 28 Nov 2012 to 15 Jun 2018
Address: 5a Andrew Road, Howick, Auckland, 2010 New Zealand
Registered address used from 09 Nov 2011 to 28 Nov 2012
Address: 5a Andrew Road, Howick, Auckland, 2010 New Zealand
Physical address used from 09 Nov 2011 to 15 Jun 2018
Address: 33/2 Bishop Dunn Place, Flat Bush, Manukau, 2013 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 11 Mar 2011 to 09 Nov 2011
Address: 1st Floor, Westfield Tower,, Westfield Shoppingtown, Pakuranga New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 14 Dec 2005 to 11 Mar 2011
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 1000
Annual return filing month: November
Annual return last filed: 02 Nov 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 1000 | |||
Individual | Brcic, Ivan |
Howick Auckland 2010 New Zealand |
14 Dec 2005 - |
Individual | Brcic, Gabrielle |
Howick Auckland 2010 New Zealand |
14 Dec 2005 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Brcic, Stefan Jure |
Howick Auckland 2010 New Zealand |
27 Feb 2015 - 07 Jun 2018 |
Individual | Brcic, Zana Monik |
Howick Auckland 2010 New Zealand |
27 Feb 2015 - 07 Jun 2018 |
Ivan Brcic - Director
Appointment date: 14 Dec 2005
Address: Howick, Auckland, 2010 New Zealand
Address used since 14 Dec 2015
Gabrielle Brcic - Director
Appointment date: 14 Dec 2005
Address: Howick, Auckland, 2010 New Zealand
Address used since 14 Dec 2015
Hongye Construction Limited
9 Andrew Road
The Celtic Supporters Of The Doyle Academy Of Irish Dance Incorporated
2a Andrew Road
Nestlings In-home Childcare Limited
8 Andrew Road
Juridcl International Sports Limited
122 Union Road
J.k.t. Limited
126 Union Road
Sefton Diesel Engineering Limited
18 Andrew Road
Builtwell Limited
2 Eaglen Place
Engitech Limited
128 Union Road
Leader Homes Limited
27 Voltaire Court
Long Investment Limited
120 Union Road
Omnicon Limited
14 Andrew Road
Paul Construction Limited
4 St Simon Place