Vernon & Vazey Truck Parts (S.i.) Limited, a registered company, was incorporated on 19 Jul 2005. 9429034681503 is the NZBN it was issued. The company has been supervised by 4 directors: Terence George Lines - an active director whose contract began on 05 Aug 2005,
Nicholas David Dolan - an inactive director whose contract began on 05 Aug 2005 and was terminated on 14 Nov 2005,
Anthony Mark Dolan - an inactive director whose contract began on 05 Aug 2005 and was terminated on 14 Nov 2005,
Phillip John Blacktopp - an inactive director whose contract began on 19 Jul 2005 and was terminated on 05 Aug 2005.
Vernon & Vazey Truck Parts (S.i.) Limited had been using The Office Of P J Blacktopp, Unit 2, St James Court, 77 Gloucester Street, Christchurch as their registered address until 26 Oct 2006.
Old names used by the company, as we managed to find at BizDb, included: from 19 Jul 2005 to 12 Oct 2005 they were called Vernon & Vazey (S.i.) Limited.
Previous address
Address: The Office Of P J Blacktopp, Unit 2, St James Court, 77 Gloucester Street, Christchurch
Registered & physical address used from 19 Jul 2005 to 26 Oct 2006
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 1200
Annual return filing month: August
Annual return last filed: 09 Aug 2021
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 1200 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Vernon & Vazey Truck Parts Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429036870820 |
Otahuhu Auckland |
09 Aug 2005 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Anthony Mark Dolan |
Christchurch |
09 Aug 2005 - 09 Aug 2005 |
Individual | Phillip John Blacktopp |
Avonhead Christchurch |
19 Jul 2005 - 27 Jun 2010 |
Individual | Nicholas David Dolan |
Burnside Christchurch |
09 Aug 2005 - 09 Aug 2005 |
Terence George Lines - Director
Appointment date: 05 Aug 2005
Address: Rd 1, Papakura, 2580 New Zealand
Address used since 22 Jun 2011
Nicholas David Dolan - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 05 Aug 2005
Termination date: 14 Nov 2005
Address: Burnside, Christchurch,
Address used since 05 Aug 2005
Anthony Mark Dolan - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 05 Aug 2005
Termination date: 14 Nov 2005
Address: Christchurch,
Address used since 05 Aug 2005
Phillip John Blacktopp - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 19 Jul 2005
Termination date: 05 Aug 2005
Address: Avonhead, Christchurch,
Address used since 19 Jul 2005
Brit-euro Car Parts Limited
12 Moa Street
Owen Evans Mechanical 1999 Limited
16 Moa Street
Project Smile Charitable Trust
2/16 Moa Street
Operation Hope Charitable Trust
2/16 Moa Street
Knighthawk Community Patrols Education & Development Trust
2/16 Moa Street
Acp European Auto Parts Limited
8 Moa Street