Max Fashions Limited was launched on 24 Jun 2005 and issued an NZBN of 9429034685242. The registered LTD company has been supervised by 20 directors: James Michael Whiting - an active director whose contract began on 07 Nov 2018,
Gary Noel Hitchcock - an active director whose contract began on 07 Nov 2018,
Christopher John Greive - an active director whose contract began on 07 Nov 2018,
Stuart James Braxton - an inactive director whose contract began on 01 May 2024 and was terminated on 11 Aug 2024,
Simon Blair West - an inactive director whose contract began on 01 Feb 2010 and was terminated on 08 Nov 2018.
As stated in BizDb's information (last updated on 27 Aug 2024), the company registered 1 address: 159 Hurstmere Road, Takapuna, Auckland, 0622 (category: registered, physical).
Up to 18 Oct 2019, Max Fashions Limited had been using 234 - 238 Khyber Pass Road, Newmarket, Auckland as their physical address.
BizDb found former names used by the company: from 24 Jun 2005 to 31 Mar 2008 they were called Max Retail Holdings Limited.
A total of 12511000 shares are allocated to 1 group (1 sole shareholder). As far as the first group is concerned, 12511000 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Max Fashions Holdings Limited (an entity) located at Takapuna, Auckland postcode 0622. Max Fashions Limited has been categorised as "Womenswear retailing" (business classification G425145).
Principal place of activity
234 - 238 Khyber Pass Road, Newmarket, Auckland, 1023 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: 234 - 238 Khyber Pass Road, Newmarket, Auckland, 1023 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 26 Mar 2019 to 18 Oct 2019
Address #2: Level 1, Lot 3, 130 Ponsonby Road, Ponsonby, Auckland, 1011 New Zealand
Physical address used from 23 Jun 2015 to 26 Mar 2019
Address #3: Level 1, Lot 3, 130 Ponsonby Road, Ponsonby, Auckland, 1011 New Zealand
Registered address used from 14 Nov 2014 to 26 Mar 2019
Address #4: Level 3, The Textile Centre, 1 Kenwyn Street, Parnell, Auckland, 1052 New Zealand
Physical address used from 16 Sep 2013 to 23 Jun 2015
Address #5: Level 3, The Textile Centre, 1 Kenwyn Street, Parnell, Auckland, 1052 New Zealand
Registered address used from 16 Sep 2013 to 14 Nov 2014
Address #6: Level 4, The Textile Centre, 1 Kenwyn, Str, Parnell, Auckland New Zealand
Registered address used from 20 Dec 2007 to 16 Sep 2013
Address #7: Level 4, The Textile Centre, 1 Kenwyn, Str, Parnell, Auckland, New Zealand New Zealand
Physical address used from 20 Dec 2007 to 20 Dec 2007
Address #8: Staples Rodway Ltd, 11th Floor, Tower Centre, 45 Queen Street, Auckland
Registered & physical address used from 06 Jul 2006 to 20 Dec 2007
Address #9: C/-staples Rodway, Level 9, Tower Centre, 45 Queen Street, Auckland
Physical & registered address used from 12 Sep 2005 to 06 Jul 2006
Address #10: Level 6, 2 Kitchener Street, Auckland
Physical & registered address used from 24 Jun 2005 to 12 Sep 2005
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 12511000
Annual return filing month: May
Annual return last filed: 21 May 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 12511000 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Max Fashions Holdings Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429030088276 |
Takapuna Auckland 0622 New Zealand |
02 Sep 2013 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Martin, Venecia Maria |
Herne Bay Auckland |
24 Jun 2005 - 30 Jul 2007 |
Entity | Ezibuy Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429039761811 Company Number: 297449 |
13 Dec 2007 - 02 Sep 2013 | |
Entity | Direct Capital Partners Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037266851 Company Number: 1034285 |
15 Jul 2005 - 30 Jul 2007 | |
Individual | Nola, Luke Russell |
Kohimarama Auckland |
12 Apr 2007 - 30 Jul 2007 |
Other | Accident Compensation Corporation | 15 Jul 2005 - 30 Jul 2007 | |
Other | Pulp & Gunn Holdings Pty Limited | 15 Nov 2005 - 12 Apr 2007 | |
Individual | Wright, David Nicholas |
Parnell Auckland |
15 Jul 2005 - 30 Jul 2007 |
Individual | Nicholson, Anthony John |
Devonport Auckland |
07 Sep 2005 - 30 Jul 2007 |
Individual | Burgham, Sandra Mariko |
Kohimarama Auckland |
12 Apr 2007 - 30 Jul 2007 |
Entity | Keegan Alexander Trustee Company Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037810528 Company Number: 915640 |
12 Apr 2007 - 30 Jul 2007 | |
Individual | Jones, Leighanne Marie |
Devonport Auckland |
07 Sep 2005 - 30 Jul 2007 |
Individual | Martin, Gregory Bryan |
Herne Bay Auckland |
12 Apr 2007 - 30 Jul 2007 |
Entity | Direct Capital Partners Beta Investments Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429034569566 Company Number: 1687437 |
29 Jun 2006 - 30 Jul 2007 | |
Entity | Hendry Nominees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429040663951 Company Number: 66341 |
15 Jul 2005 - 30 Jul 2007 | |
Entity | Pohutukawa Beta Investments Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429035241119 Company Number: 1543425 |
15 Jul 2005 - 30 Jul 2007 | |
Entity | Direct Capital Partners Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037266851 Company Number: 1034285 |
15 Jul 2005 - 30 Jul 2007 | |
Entity | Keegan Alexander Trustee Company Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037810528 Company Number: 915640 |
12 Apr 2007 - 30 Jul 2007 | |
Entity | Direct Management Investments Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429036528912 Company Number: 1204753 |
24 Jun 2005 - 30 Jul 2007 | |
Individual | Jones, Leighanne Marie |
Devonport Auckland |
24 Jun 2005 - 15 Jul 2005 |
Entity | Direct Capital Partners Beta Investments Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429034569566 Company Number: 1687437 |
29 Jun 2006 - 30 Jul 2007 | |
Entity | Hendry Nominees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429040663951 Company Number: 66341 |
15 Jul 2005 - 30 Jul 2007 | |
Other | Null - Pulp & Gunn Holdings Pty Limited | 15 Nov 2005 - 12 Apr 2007 | |
Other | Null - Accident Compensation Corporation | 15 Jul 2005 - 30 Jul 2007 | |
Individual | Beagley, Michael John |
Auchenflower Brisbane, Australia 4006 |
30 Jul 2007 - 30 Jul 2007 |
Entity | Pohutukawa Beta Investments Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429035241119 Company Number: 1543425 |
15 Jul 2005 - 30 Jul 2007 | |
Entity | Direct Management Investments Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429036528912 Company Number: 1204753 |
24 Jun 2005 - 30 Jul 2007 | |
Individual | Lowry, Ian James |
Devonport Auckland |
07 Sep 2005 - 30 Jul 2007 |
Entity | Ezibuy Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429039761811 Company Number: 297449 |
13 Dec 2007 - 02 Sep 2013 |
Ultimate Holding Company
James Michael Whiting - Director
Appointment date: 07 Nov 2018
Address: Kingsland, Auckland, 1021 New Zealand
Address used since 07 Nov 2018
Gary Noel Hitchcock - Director
Appointment date: 07 Nov 2018
Address: Mellons Bay, Auckland, 2014 New Zealand
Address used since 07 Nov 2018
Christopher John Greive - Director
Appointment date: 07 Nov 2018
Address: Russell, Russell, 0202 New Zealand
Address used since 10 Sep 2021
Address: Herne Bay, Auckland, 1011 New Zealand
Address used since 07 Nov 2018
Stuart James Braxton - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 01 May 2024
Termination date: 11 Aug 2024
Address: Ilam, Christchurch, 8041 New Zealand
Address used since 01 May 2024
Simon Blair West - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 01 Feb 2010
Termination date: 08 Nov 2018
Address: Glendowie, Auckland, 1071 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Jul 2016
Address: St Heliers, Auckland, 1071 New Zealand
Address used since 28 May 2014
John William Michael Journee - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 24 Sep 2013
Termination date: 08 Nov 2018
Address: Murrays Bay, Auckland, 0630 New Zealand
Address used since 24 Sep 2013
Gerard Francis Gillespie - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 24 Sep 2013
Termination date: 08 Nov 2018
Address: Hokowhitu, Palmerston North, 4410 New Zealand
Address used since 24 Sep 2013
Trent Peterson - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 24 Sep 2013
Termination date: 08 Nov 2018
ASIC Name: Adairs Limited
Address: Scoresby, Victoria, 3179 Australia
Address: Scoresby, Victoria, 3179 Australia
Address: Woollahra, Sydney, 2025 Australia
Address used since 04 May 2016
John Masterson Kelly - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 30 Aug 2013
Termination date: 25 Sep 2015
Address: Ponsonby, Auckland, 1011 New Zealand
Address used since 28 May 2014
Kevin James Gillespie - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 11 Dec 2007
Termination date: 30 Aug 2013
Address: Milford, Auckland, 0620 New Zealand
Address used since 11 Dec 2007
Stephen Daniel Mackay - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 27 Apr 2011
Termination date: 01 Jul 2013
Address: Remuera, Auckland, 1050 New Zealand
Address used since 27 Apr 2011
Mark Charles Singleton - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 25 Nov 2010
Termination date: 06 May 2011
Address: Westmere, Auckland, 1022 New Zealand
Address used since 25 Nov 2010
James Michael Whiting - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 01 Feb 2010
Termination date: 25 Nov 2010
Address: Kingsland, Auckland, 1021 New Zealand
Address used since 27 May 2010
Mary Monica Devine - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 11 Dec 2007
Termination date: 01 Feb 2010
Address: Fendalton, Christchurch, New Zealand,
Address used since 11 Dec 2007
Ross Andrew George - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 24 Jun 2005
Termination date: 11 Dec 2007
Address: Auckland,
Address used since 24 Jun 2005
Anthony David Batterton - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 24 Jun 2005
Termination date: 11 Dec 2007
Address: Epsom, Auckland,
Address used since 24 Jun 2005
Leighanne Marie Jones - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 31 Aug 2005
Termination date: 11 Dec 2007
Address: Devonport, Auckland,
Address used since 31 Aug 2005
David Nicholas Wright - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 31 Aug 2005
Termination date: 11 Dec 2007
Address: Parnell, Auckland,
Address used since 31 Aug 2005
Michael John Beagley - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 31 Aug 2005
Termination date: 11 Dec 2007
Address: Auchenflower, Brisbane, Australia 4006,
Address used since 31 Aug 2005
Sandra Mariko Burgham - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 09 Nov 2006
Termination date: 11 Dec 2007
Address: Kohimarama, Auckland,
Address used since 09 Nov 2006
Lejand Nz Limited
Level 1, 172 Ponsonby Road
Inception (nz) Limited
Level 1/33 Ponsonby Road
Lateral Lawyers Limited
Level 4, 26 Hobson Street
The Barrier Company Limited
Level 4, 35 High Street
Soho Wine Company Limited
Level 1, 202 Jervois Road
Bold Communication (2007) Limited
Level 1, 33 Ponsonby Road
Boutique 299 Limited
299 Ponsonby Road
Encore Designer Seconds Limited
305 Ponsonby Road
Goodness Auckland Limited
158 Jervois Road
Max Fashions Holdings Limited
Level 1, Lot 3, 130 Ponsonby Road
Mgh Studio Limited
20 Jervois Road
Shoshamma Manufacturing Limited
85 Shelly Beach Road